EP2584447 - Method and apparatus for operating menu screen of user device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.04.2019 [2019/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Park, Sehwan 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 02 /
Park, Youngjoo 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | 03 /
Choi, Jinhee 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited Mill House North Street York YO1 6JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Gover, Richard Paul, et al Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | ||
Former [2013/17] | Harrison Goddard Foote Saviour House 9 St. Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12188846.5 | 17.10.2012 | [2013/17] | Priority number, date | KR20110105751 | 17.10.2011 Original published format: KR 20110105751 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2584447 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2584447 | Date: | 02.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0481, G06F3/0482 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
G06F3/0482 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/04817 (EP,KR,US);
G06F3/14 (KR);
G06F3/147 (KR);
H04M1/72403 (KR);
H04M1/72469 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bedienung eines Menübildschirms einer Benutzervorrichtung | [2013/17] | English: | Method and apparatus for operating menu screen of user device | [2013/17] | French: | Procédé et appareil de commande d'écran de menu du dispositif utilisateur | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2016 | Examination requested [2016/28] | 28.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/17] | 13.12.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/17] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1207449 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-3,9-13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0 11] - [0012] - [0 16] - [0019] - [0 21] , [0 22]; figures 1,3 * [I] 4-8,14; | [XI]US2006095864 (MOCK VON A [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9-13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0015] , [0 17] - [0018]; figures 1-3 * [I] 4,5,14; | [X]US2002075319 (HOCHMUTH ROLAND M [US]) [X] 1,9-13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0027] - [0 34]; figures 1, 3, 5aA *; | [XI]US2008313567 (SABIN JASON ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] - [0022]; figures 2-4B * [I] 10; | [XA]US2011191611 (BONI ANG GAW GO MARVIN [JP], et al) [X] 1,9,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0032] - [0036] - [0055] - [0056] - [0 98]; figures 2-7 * [A] 4,5,12,14; | [XA]EP1777611 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA]) [X] 1-3,9,13,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0055] - [0083]; figures 3-6D * [A] 12; | [A]US2008307364 (CHAUDHRI IMRAN A [US], et al) [A] 6-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0115] , [ 123]; figure 10 * |