EP2722774 - Long term archiving of data in a MES system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2016 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2014/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mazzarone, Marco via Luciano Zamperini 11a/15 16162 Genova / IT | 02 /
Risso, Federico Viale Ansaldo 2A/19 16137 Genova / IT | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Intellectual Property Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/33] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/17] | Fischer, Michael Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12189048.7 | 18.10.2012 | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2722774 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2722774 | Date: | 09.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
G06F16/27 (EP,US);
G06F16/214 (CN,US);
G06F16/10 (EP,US);
G06F16/188 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/50] |
Former [2014/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Langfristige Archivierung von Daten in einem MES-System | [2014/17] | English: | Long term archiving of data in a MES system | [2014/17] | French: | Archivage à long terme de données dans un système MES | [2014/17] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 22.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 18.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.10.2012 | AL | 09.12.2015 | AT | 09.12.2015 | BE | 09.12.2015 | BG | 09.12.2015 | CY | 09.12.2015 | CZ | 09.12.2015 | DK | 09.12.2015 | EE | 09.12.2015 | ES | 09.12.2015 | FI | 09.12.2015 | HR | 09.12.2015 | LT | 09.12.2015 | LV | 09.12.2015 | MC | 09.12.2015 | MK | 09.12.2015 | NL | 09.12.2015 | PL | 09.12.2015 | RO | 09.12.2015 | RS | 09.12.2015 | SE | 09.12.2015 | SI | 09.12.2015 | SK | 09.12.2015 | SM | 09.12.2015 | TR | 09.12.2015 | NO | 09.03.2016 | GR | 10.03.2016 | IS | 09.04.2016 | PT | 11.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
TR | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
BG | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.10.2012 | |
AT | 09.12.2015 | ||
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CY | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
HR | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
MC | 09.12.2015 | ||
MK | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
BE | 09.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
PL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SI | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
DK | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
SM | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
IS | 09.04.2016 | ||
PT | 11.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 09.12.2015 | |
CZ | 09.12.2015 | ||
EE | 09.12.2015 | ||
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RO | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
SK | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 09.12.2015 | |
ES | 09.12.2015 | ||
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
IS | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
NL | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
LV | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
FI | 09.12.2015 | ||
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
GR | 10.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
RS | 09.12.2015 | ||
SE | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | ||
NO | 09.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 09.12.2015 | |
LT | 09.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US7548898 (TARENSKEEN HERBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 4 * * column 5, line 1 - column 16 * * column 6, line 22 - line 28 *; | [A] - CUI JIN ET AL, "Research and Application of Data Archiving based on Oracle Dual Database Structure", JOURNAL OF SOFTWARE, (20120427), vol. 7, no. 4, doi:10.4304/jsw.7.4.844-848, ISSN 1796-217X, pages 844 - 848, XP055056152 [A] 1-3 * abstract * * page 844, column r, paragraph 2 - page 845, column r, paragraph 5 * * page 846, column l, paragraph 3 - paragraph l * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4304/jsw.7.4.844-848 | [A] - LEE J ET AL, "OPTIMIZING FAB PERFORMANCE WITH MES-DATABASE ACTIVE ARCHIVING", SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY, PENNWELL CORPORATION, TULSA, OK, US, (20030401), vol. 46, no. 4, ISSN 0038-111X, page 55/56,58, XP001170216 [A] 1-3 * page 56, column r, paragraph 3 - page 58, paragraph 3; figures 1,2 * * page 58, column r, paragraph 2 - paragraph l * |