EP2584173 - Gas Turbine Engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2013/17] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suciu, Gabriel L. 27 Tanglewood Drive Glastonbury, CT Connecticut 06033 / US | 02 /
Merry, Brian D. 220 Bear Swamp Road Andover, CT Connecticut 06232 / US | 03 /
Dye, Christopher M. 3131 Clairemont Drive, 3 San Diego, CA California 92117 / US | [2013/17] | Representative(s) | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/51] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | ||
Former [2013/17] | Leckey, David Herbert Dehns 10 Salisbury Square London Greater London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 12189281.4 | 19.10.2012 | [2013/17] | Priority number, date | US201113278378 | 21.10.2011 Original published format: US201113278378 | [2013/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2584173 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2584173 | Date: | 16.12.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02C7/32, F02C7/36, B64C13/50 | [2013/17] | CPC: |
F02C7/36 (EP,US);
F02C7/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/51] |
Former [2013/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Gasturbinenmotor | [2013/17] | English: | Gas Turbine Engine | [2013/17] | French: | Moteur à turbine à gaz | [2013/17] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.09.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.10.2012 | AL | 16.12.2015 | AT | 16.12.2015 | BE | 16.12.2015 | BG | 16.12.2015 | CY | 16.12.2015 | CZ | 16.12.2015 | DK | 16.12.2015 | EE | 16.12.2015 | ES | 16.12.2015 | FI | 16.12.2015 | HR | 16.12.2015 | IT | 16.12.2015 | LT | 16.12.2015 | LV | 16.12.2015 | MC | 16.12.2015 | MK | 16.12.2015 | NL | 16.12.2015 | PL | 16.12.2015 | RO | 16.12.2015 | RS | 16.12.2015 | SE | 16.12.2015 | SI | 16.12.2015 | SK | 16.12.2015 | SM | 16.12.2015 | TR | 16.12.2015 | NO | 16.03.2016 | GR | 17.03.2016 | IS | 16.04.2016 | PT | 18.04.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 19.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
BG | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 19.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 19.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
TR | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 19.10.2012 | |
AT | 16.12.2015 | ||
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CY | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
MC | 16.12.2015 | ||
MK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/16] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SI | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
BE | 16.12.2015 | ||
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
PL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
DK | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
SM | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
IS | 16.04.2016 | ||
PT | 18.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 16.12.2015 | |
CZ | 16.12.2015 | ||
EE | 16.12.2015 | ||
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
IT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RO | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
SK | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
ES | 16.12.2015 | ||
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 16.12.2015 | |
FI | 16.12.2015 | ||
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
NL | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
LV | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | FI | 16.12.2015 | |
HR | 16.12.2015 | ||
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
GR | 17.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 16.12.2015 | |
LT | 16.12.2015 | ||
RS | 16.12.2015 | ||
SE | 16.12.2015 | ||
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 16.12.2015 | |
NO | 16.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 16.12.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2005056021 (BELOKON ALEXANDER A [RU], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,10,13 * page 2, paragraph 15 - page 3, paragraph 17 * * page 4, paragraph 37 - page 6, paragraph 49; figures 1-10 * [Y] 5,7-9,14,15 [I] 3; | [Y]US2006012180 (HOPPE RICHARD J [US], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraph [0008] *; | [Y]US2009302153 (MATASSO ANTHONY F [US], et al) [Y] 7-9,14,15 * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 12; figures 1,4 ** page 4, paragraph 27 - page 4, paragraph 28 *; | [I]US2010013223 (CERTAIN BERNARD [FR]) [I] 1,10 * page 3, paragraph 77 - page 3, paragraph 80; figures 4,5 *; | [X]EP2226487 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,10 * column 8, paragraph 55 - column 9, paragraph 59; figures 1-3 * |