EP2722193 - Secure data carrier and method of production of said secure data carrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gemalto SA 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2014/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Purdy, Steve GEMALTO S.A. Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | 02 /
Chabut, Françoise GEMALTO S.A., Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [2014/17] | Representative(s) | Cour, Pierre Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, Rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Cour, Pierre Gemalto SA Intellectual Property Department 6, rue de la Verrerie 92190 Meudon / FR | Application number, filing date | 12189318.4 | 19.10.2012 | [2014/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2722193 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B42D25/00, G07D7/00 | [2014/17] | CPC: |
B42D25/00 (EP,US);
B42D25/351 (US);
B32B3/266 (US);
B42D25/346 (US);
B42D25/45 (US);
B32B2307/402 (US);
B32B2307/404 (US);
B32B2307/41 (US);
B32B2307/414 (US);
B32B2425/00 (US);
B32B2429/00 (US);
B42D2033/20 (EP);
B42D2035/24 (EP);
B42D2035/36 (EP);
B42D25/47 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24331 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/17] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Sicherer Datenträger und Verfahren zur Herstellung dieses sicheren Datenträgers | [2014/17] | English: | Secure data carrier and method of production of said secure data carrier | [2014/17] | French: | Support de données sécurisées et procédé de production dudit support de données sécurisées | [2014/17] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 01.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/18] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2005116463 (KREUTER RUDIGER G [DE]) [A] 1-10* Abstract; column 2 - column 3; figures 1-3 *; | [A]EP2199098 (GEMALTO SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * Abstract; paragraph [0014]; figure 1 *; | [A]EP2236311 (GEMALTO SA [FR]) [A] 1-10 * Abstract; paragraphs [0020] , [0021]; figures 2,5 * |