EP2586998 - Turbine radial sensor measurement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.10.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.11.2016 [2016/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Snider, David August 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 02 /
Jordan, Harold Lamar, Jr. 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 03 /
Holsonback, Christopher Ryan 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Cleary, Fidelma GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Cleary, Fidelma GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12189377.0 | 22.10.2012 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | US201113280565 | 25.10.2011 Original published format: US201113280565 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2586998 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/08, F01D21/00 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
F01D17/08 (EP,US);
F01D21/003 (EP,US);
F05D2200/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Turbinenradialsensormessung | [2013/18] | English: | Turbine radial sensor measurement | [2013/18] | French: | Capteurs de mesure disposés radialement dans une turbine | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/45] | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |