EP2586984 - TURBINE ROTOR BLADE AND CORRESPONDING TURBOMACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/18] | Turbine rotor blade and corresponding turbomachine | ||
[2019/36] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.01.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.12.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stein, Alexander General Electric Company 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 02 /
Boyer, Bradley General Electric Company 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 03 /
Pierre, Sylvain General Electric Company 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Freigutpartners IP Law Firm Hahnrainweg 4 5400 Baden / CH | [2020/08] |
Former [2013/18] | Cleary, Fidelma GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12189881.1 | 25.10.2012 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | US201113284010 | 28.10.2011 Original published format: US201113284010 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2586984 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2586984 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2586984 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/20 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
F01D5/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] |
Former [2013/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | TURBINENLAUFSCHAUFEL UND ZUGEHÖRIGE TURBOMASCHINE | [2019/36] | English: | TURBINE ROTOR BLADE AND CORRESPONDING TURBOMACHINE | [2019/36] | French: | AUBE ROTORIQUE DE TURBINE ET TURBOMACHINE ASSOCIÉE | [2019/36] |
Former [2013/18] | Turbinenlaufschaufel und zugehörige Turbomaschine | ||
Former [2013/18] | Turbine rotor blade and corresponding turbomachine | ||
Former [2013/18] | Aube rotorique de turbine et turbomachine associée | Examination procedure | 28.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.12.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 05.08.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 13.12.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.01.2020 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.01.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2019 | Opposition(s) | 20.11.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.10.2012 | AL | 19.02.2020 | AT | 19.02.2020 | CY | 19.02.2020 | CZ | 19.02.2020 | DK | 19.02.2020 | EE | 19.02.2020 | ES | 19.02.2020 | FI | 19.02.2020 | HR | 19.02.2020 | LT | 19.02.2020 | LV | 19.02.2020 | MC | 19.02.2020 | MK | 19.02.2020 | MT | 19.02.2020 | NL | 19.02.2020 | PL | 19.02.2020 | RO | 19.02.2020 | RS | 19.02.2020 | SE | 19.02.2020 | SI | 19.02.2020 | SK | 19.02.2020 | SM | 19.02.2020 | TR | 19.02.2020 | BG | 19.05.2020 | NO | 19.05.2020 | GR | 20.05.2020 | IS | 19.06.2020 | PT | 12.07.2020 | GB | 25.10.2020 | IE | 25.10.2020 | LU | 25.10.2020 | BE | 31.10.2020 | CH | 31.10.2020 | FR | 31.10.2020 | LI | 31.10.2020 | [2022/31] |
Former [2022/30] | HU | 25.10.2012 | |
AL | 19.02.2020 | ||
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
GB | 25.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.10.2012 | |
AT | 19.02.2020 | ||
CY | 19.02.2020 | ||
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
MT | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
GB | 25.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
TR | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
GB | 25.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
GB | 25.10.2020 | ||
IE | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
GB | 25.10.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
CH | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
LI | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
BE | 31.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
FR | 31.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
MC | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
LU | 25.10.2020 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AT | 19.02.2020 | |
CZ | 19.02.2020 | ||
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
PL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SI | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
EE | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | CZ | 19.02.2020 | |
DK | 19.02.2020 | ||
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SK | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RO | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
SM | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
PT | 12.07.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | DK | 19.02.2020 | |
ES | 19.02.2020 | ||
FI | 19.02.2020 | ||
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LT | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/45] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
NL | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/40] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
IS | 19.06.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
BG | 19.05.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/38] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
GR | 20.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
HR | 19.02.2020 | ||
LV | 19.02.2020 | ||
RS | 19.02.2020 | ||
SE | 19.02.2020 | ||
NO | 19.05.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | FI | 19.02.2020 | |
NO | 19.05.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3635585 (METZLER CHARLES WALTER JR) [X] 1,4,6,11 * figure - *; | [XY]US5927946 (LEE CHING-PANG [US]) [X] 1-8,11 * figure - * [Y] 9,10; | [Y]US2008050243 (LIANG GEORGE [US]) [Y] 9 * figure - *; | [Y]US2008175714 (SPANGLER BRANDON W [US], et al) [Y] 10* figure - * |