EP2589976 - Stacked RF coil for magnetic resonance imaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMRIS Inc. 5101 Shady Oak Road Minnetonka, MN 55343 / US | [2019/43] |
Former [2013/19] | For all designated states Imris Inc. Suite 100-1370 Sony Place Winnipeg, Manitoba R3T 1N5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhu, Haoqin c/o Suite 100 1370 Sony Place Winnipeg, Manitoba, R3T 1N5 / CA | 02 /
Wang, Grace Fengqi 1356 Lee Blvd. Winnipeg, R3T 6E2 / CA | [2013/19] | Representative(s) | Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Metzgerstraße 61 52070 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/19] | Jostarndt, Hans-Dieter Jostarndt Patentanwalts-AG Brüsseler Ring 51 52074 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12189898.5 | 25.10.2012 | [2013/19] | Priority number, date | CA20112757209 | 04.11.2011 Original published format: CA 2757209 | [2013/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2589976 | Date: | 08.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/3415, G01R33/36, G01R33/34 | [2013/19] | CPC: |
G01R33/365 (EP);
G01R33/34007 (EP);
G01R33/3415 (EP);
G01R33/34084 (EP);
G01R33/3642 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/19] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gestapelte HF-Spule für Magnetresonanzbildgebung | [2013/19] | English: | Stacked RF coil for magnetic resonance imaging | [2013/19] | French: | Bobine RF empilée pour imagerie par résonance magnétique | [2013/19] | Examination procedure | 07.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/51] | 09.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   17.11.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2009076377 (FINDEKELEE CHRISTIAN [DE]) [X] 1-7,11,12,14 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0028] * * figures 1, 6 * [I] 8-10,13,15; | [XI]US6900637 (SEEBER DEREK A [US]) [X] 1-7,11,13,14 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 24 * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 8-10,12,15; | [XI]US2007085634 (DU JIAN-JUN [CN], et al) [X] 1-7,11-14 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0027] * * figure 5 * [I] 8-10,15; | [XI]US2008129296 (FISCHER HUBERTUS [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,11-14 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0048] * * figures 1, 2 * [I] 8-10,15; | [XI]US2007016003 (PIRON CAMERON A [CA], et al) [X] 1-7,13,14 * paragraph [0107] * * figures 8G, 8H * [I] 8-12,15; | [Y]US2005073309 (WILLIAMS NEIL R [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0052] * * figures 4A-4C *; | [Y]US2002169374 (JEVTIC JOVAN [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US2009096456 (BIBER STEPHAN [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | CA2753561 | US20090546148 |