EP2586562 - Methods for repairing turbine blade tips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2013/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bunker, Ronald Scott General Electric Company 1 Research Circle Building K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/18] | Cleary, Fidelma GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12190056.7 | 25.10.2012 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | US201113283831 | 28.10.2011 Original published format: US201113283831 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2586562 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2586562 | Date: | 23.03.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2016 | Classification | IPC: | B23P6/00, F01D5/00 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
B23K10/027 (EP,US);
B23K26/32 (EP,US);
B23K26/342 (EP,US);
B23K5/18 (EP,US);
B23K9/048 (EP,US);
B23K9/167 (EP,US);
B23K9/173 (EP,US);
B23P6/007 (EP,US);
F01D5/005 (EP,US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,US);
B23K2101/34 (EP,US);
B23K2103/08 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US);
F05D2230/10 (EP,US);
F05D2240/307 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49318 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/44] |
Former [2013/18] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Methoden zur Reparatur von Turbinenschaufelspitzen | [2013/18] | English: | Methods for repairing turbine blade tips | [2013/18] | French: | Procédés de réparation des extrémités d'aubes de turbine | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 23.09.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2016 | Examination requested [2016/44] | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 01.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6595749 (LEE CHING-PANG [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6-10 * figures 1-3 * * column 2, line 20 - line 47 * * column 5, line 49 - line 60 * [Y] 12,13; | [X]US2007248750 (ALLEN DAVID B [US]) [X] 1-8,10 * paragraphs [0014] , [0024]; figures 4-6 *; | [XY]US2010111704 (HADA SATOSHI [JP]) [X] 11 * figures 1,2,5 * * paragraphs [0039] , [0052] , [0061] , [0068] , [0073] * [Y] 12,13; | [A]EP2071126 (HONEYWELL INT INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0006] , [0040] , [0042]; figure - * | by applicant | US7282681 | US5261789 |