EP2621193 - Device for transmitting sensor data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.03.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Dr. Johannes-Heidenhain-Strasse 5 83301 Traunreut / DE | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kreuzer, Stephan, Dr. Georgistr. 3 83362 Surberg-Ettendorf / DE | [2013/31] | Application number, filing date | 12190110.2 | 26.10.2012 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | DE201210201170 | 27.01.2012 Original published format: DE102012201170 | [2013/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2621193 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2621193 | Date: | 15.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2621193 | Date: | 14.08.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q9/00 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
G06F13/36 (EP,US);
G05B19/056 (EP,US);
G06F13/4291 (EP,US);
H04L12/40006 (EP,US);
H04L12/4625 (EP,US);
H04Q9/00 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25217 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31121 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/30 (EP,US);
H04Q2209/845 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/25] |
Former [2013/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Übertragung von Sensordaten | [2013/31] | English: | Device for transmitting sensor data | [2013/31] | French: | Dispositif de transmission de données de capteur | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 15.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/25] | 18.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2019 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.10.2012 | AL | 14.08.2019 | CY | 14.08.2019 | DK | 14.08.2019 | EE | 14.08.2019 | FI | 14.08.2019 | HR | 14.08.2019 | LT | 14.08.2019 | LV | 14.08.2019 | MC | 14.08.2019 | MK | 14.08.2019 | MT | 14.08.2019 | NL | 14.08.2019 | PL | 14.08.2019 | RO | 14.08.2019 | RS | 14.08.2019 | SE | 14.08.2019 | SI | 14.08.2019 | SK | 14.08.2019 | SM | 14.08.2019 | TR | 14.08.2019 | AT | 26.10.2019 | IE | 26.10.2019 | LU | 26.10.2019 | BE | 31.10.2019 | FR | 31.10.2019 | BG | 14.11.2019 | NO | 14.11.2019 | GR | 15.11.2019 | IS | 14.12.2019 | PT | 16.12.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 26.10.2012 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
MT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 26.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 26.10.2012 | |
AL | 14.08.2019 | ||
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 26.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
CY | 14.08.2019 | ||
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 26.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2021/11] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
AT | 26.10.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
FR | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
IE | 26.10.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SI | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BE | 31.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LU | 26.10.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
MC | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
SM | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
SK | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
PL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RO | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
DK | 14.08.2019 | ||
EE | 14.08.2019 | ||
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
TR | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 14.08.2019 | |
FI | 14.08.2019 | ||
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
IS | 14.12.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
HR | 14.08.2019 | ||
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
LV | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
RS | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
GR | 15.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
SE | 14.08.2019 | ||
BG | 14.11.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
PT | 16.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 14.08.2019 | |
LT | 14.08.2019 | ||
NL | 14.08.2019 | ||
NO | 14.11.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 14.08.2019 | |
NO | 14.11.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE10306231 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE], et al) [AD] 1-7 * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0027] *; | [A]WO2007004178 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-7* page 8, line 2 - line 11 *; | [A]WO2010069664 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 5, line 7 - page 7, line 22 * | by applicant | EP0171579 | EP0660209 | DE10306231 | DE102006041056 |