EP2608035 - Storage control device and method for controlling a dumping function in a storage system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ando, Shun c/o PFU LIMITED 98-2, Nu, Unoke Kahoku-shi ISHIKAWA, 929-1192 / JP | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12190348.8 | 29.10.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | JP20110277332 | 19.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011277332 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2608035 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/07, // G06F11/34 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
G06F11/0778 (EP,US);
G11C7/10 (KR);
G06F11/0727 (EP,US);
G06F13/14 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Steuervorrichtung und Verfahren zur Steuerung einer Auszugsfunktion in einem Speichersystem | [2013/26] | English: | Storage control device and method for controlling a dumping function in a storage system | [2013/26] | French: | Dispositif de commande et procédé de contrôle d'une fonction de vidage mémoire dans un système de stockage | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 18.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/48] | 19.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.11.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IY]US2006218345 (YOSHIDA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [I] 1,2,5,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0059] - [0065] - [0073] - [0077] - [0146] - [0150] - [0160] , [0161] , [0177] - [0179] * * figures 1,2,9,15,16 * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]US7707462 (HARRIS MICHAEL D [US]) [Y] 3,4 * abstract * * column 1, line 11 - line 53 * * column 3, line 64 - column 5, line 19 * * column 8, line 48 - column 9, line 4 *; | [A]WO2005073858 (NETWORK APPLIANCE INC [US]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * page 19, line 18 - page 21, line 15 * * page 7, line 8 - line 22 * * figures 1,6 *; | [A]US2010332914 (UEBA TAKUMA [JP]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] , [0016] , [0028] - [0031] - [0035] * * figures 1b,2,3a,3b,4 * | by applicant | JPH09160884 | JPH11338838 |