EP2724746 - System and method for scheduling light therapy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valkee Oy Elektroniikkatie 4 90590 Oulu / FI | [2014/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nissilä, Juuso Seurakuja 8 ad. 1 91100 Ii / FI | 02 /
Jurvelin, Heidi Vajakuja 5 90240 Oulu / FI | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 12190370.2 | 29.10.2012 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2724746 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2724746 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/06 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
A61N5/0618 (EP);
A61N2005/0605 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Planung einer Lichttherapie | [2014/18] | English: | System and method for scheduling light therapy | [2014/18] | French: | Système et procédé de programmation de thérapie lumineuse | [2014/18] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 24.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.10.2012 | AL | 10.12.2014 | AT | 10.12.2014 | BE | 10.12.2014 | BG | 10.12.2014 | CY | 10.12.2014 | CZ | 10.12.2014 | DK | 10.12.2014 | EE | 10.12.2014 | ES | 10.12.2014 | FI | 10.12.2014 | HR | 10.12.2014 | IT | 10.12.2014 | LT | 10.12.2014 | LV | 10.12.2014 | MC | 10.12.2014 | MK | 10.12.2014 | MT | 10.12.2014 | NL | 10.12.2014 | PL | 10.12.2014 | RO | 10.12.2014 | RS | 10.12.2014 | SE | 10.12.2014 | SI | 10.12.2014 | SK | 10.12.2014 | SM | 10.12.2014 | TR | 10.12.2014 | NO | 10.03.2015 | GR | 11.03.2015 | IS | 10.04.2015 | PT | 10.04.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 29.10.2012 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MK | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
TR | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 29.10.2012 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MK | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 29.10.2012 | |
AT | 10.12.2014 | ||
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
BG | 10.12.2014 | ||
CY | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
MT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
SM | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
MC | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
BE | 10.12.2014 | ||
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SI | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
IT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
DK | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
IS | 10.04.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
PL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
SK | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
CZ | 10.12.2014 | ||
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RO | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
EE | 10.12.2014 | ||
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
PT | 10.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/29] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
NL | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 10.12.2014 | |
ES | 10.12.2014 | ||
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
HR | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
LV | 10.12.2014 | ||
RS | 10.12.2014 | ||
SE | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
GR | 11.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 10.12.2014 | |
FI | 10.12.2014 | ||
LT | 10.12.2014 | ||
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 10.12.2014 | |
NO | 10.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 10.12.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]WO2008029001 (NISSILAE JUUSO [FI], et al) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2004110305 (LETO HOLDINGS LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0051] *; | [A]WO2012130958 (VALKEE OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 61, line 1 - line 19 * | [Y] - KOLLA, B AND AUGER, R., "Jet lag and shift work sleep disorders:How to help reset the internal clock", CLEVELAND CLINIC JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (20111001), vol. 78, no. 10, pages 675 - 684, XP002693915 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3949/ccjm.78a.10083 | by applicant | WO9851372 | WO2008029001 | - AUGER RR; MORGENTHALER TI, "Jet lag and other sleep disorders relevant to the traveller", TRAVEL MEDICINE AND INFECTIOUS DISEASE, (2009), vol. 7, pages 60 - 68 | - BLACKSHAW, S.; SNYDER, S.H., "Encephalopsin: a novel mammalian extraretinal opsin discretely localized in the brain", J. NEUROSCI., (1999), vol. 19, pages 3681 - 3690 | - BURGESS HJ; CROWLEY SJ; GAZDA CJ; FOGG LF; EASTLAM CI., "Preflight adjustment to eastward travel: 3 days of advancing sleep with and without morning bright light", J BIOL RHYTHMS, (2003), vol. 18, pages 318 - 28 | - CAJOCHEN C., "Alerting effects of light", SLEEP MEDICINE REVIEWS, (2007), vol. 11, pages 453 - 464 | - CAMPBELL SS; MURPHY PJ; SUHNER AG., "Extraocular phototransduction and circadian timing systems in vertebrates", CHRONOBIOL INT, (2001), vol. 18, pages 137 - 72 | - CHO K; ENNACEUR A; COLE JC; SUH CK., "Chronic jet lag procedures cognitive deficit", J NEUROSCI, (2000), vol. 20, pages 1 - 5 | - CLAYTON J; KYRIACOU C; REPPERT S., "Keeping time with the human genome", NATURE, (2001), vol. 409, pages 829 - 31 | - EASTMAN CI; GAZDA CJ; BURGESS HJ; CROWLEY SJ; FOGG LF., "Advancing circadian rhythms before eastward flight: a strategy to preventor reduce jetlag", SLEEP, (2005), vol. 28, pages 33 - 44 | - GANONG WF; SHEPHERD MD; WALL JR; VAN BRUNT EE; CLEGG MT., "Penetration of light into the brain of mammals", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1963), vol. 72, pages 962 - 3 | - GOOLEY JJ., "Treatment of circadian rhythm sleep disorders with light", ANN ACAD MED SINGAPORE, (2008), vol. 37, pages 669 - 76 | - HAIMOV , ARENDT J., "The prevention and treatment of jetlag", SLEEP MEDICINE REVIEWS, (1999), vol. 3, pages 229 - 40 | - HASTINGS MH; BEST JD; MAYWOOD ES; SMITH KL., "Rapid Resetting of the Mammalian Circadian Clock", THE JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE, (19990115), vol. 19, no. 2, pages 828 - 835 | - JURVELIN H; NISSILA J; TIMONEN M; TAKALA T; JOKELAINEN J; RASANEN P., "Transcranial Bright Light Treatment via Ear Canals in Seasonal Affective Disorder (SAD) - a Randomized Controlled Trial", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PSYCHIATRY IN CLINICAL PRACTICE, (2011), vol. 15, no. 2, pages 27 - 28 | - KHALSA SS; JEWETT ME; CAJOCHEN J; CZEISLERCA., "A phase response curveto single bright light pulses in human subjects", J PHYSIOL., (2003), vol. 549, pages 945 - 52 | - LEIN, E.S.; HAWRYLYCZ, M.J.; AO, N.; AYRES, M.; BENSINGER, A. ET AL., "Genome-wide atlas of gene expression in the adult mouse brain.Genome-wide atlas of gene expression in the adult mouse brain", NATURE, (2007), vol. 445, pages 168 - 176 | - MCEWEN BS; SAPOLSKY RM., "Stress and cognitive function", CURR OPIN NEUROBIOL, (1995), vol. 5, pages 205 - 216 | - NISSILA J; MANTTARI S; TUOMINEN H; SARKIOJA T; TIMONEN M; SAARELA S., "The Abundance and Distribution of Encephalopsin (OPN3) Protein in Human Brain", ABSTRACT FOR THE SCANDINAVIAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY'S ANNUAL MEETING, (20110812), page 107 | - RECHT LD; LEW RA; SCHWARTZ WJ, "Baseball teams beaten by jetlag", NATURE, (1995), vol. 377, page 583 | - REILLY T; WATERHOUSE J; EDWARDS B., "Some chronobiological and physiological problems associated with long-distance journeys", TRAVEL MED INFECT DIS, (2009), vol. 7, pages 88 - 101 | - REILLY T; WATERHOUSE J; EDWARDS B., "Jet lag and air travel: Implication for performance", CLIN SPORT MED, (2005), vol. 24, pages 367 - 80 | - REVELL VL; EASTMAN CI., "How to trick mother nature into letting you fly around and stay up all night", J BIOL RHYTHMS, (2005), vol. 20, pages 353 - 65 | - TAKAHASHI JS; HONG HK; KO CH; MCDEARMON EL., "The genetics of mammalian circadian order and disorder: Implication for physiology and disease", NAT REV GENET, (2008), vol. 9, pages 764 - 775 | - TIMONEN M; JOKELAINEN J; JURVELIN H; NISSILA J; AUNIO A; RÄSÄNEN P; TAKALA T., "Can transcranial brain-targeted bright light treatment via ear canals be effective in relieving symptoms in seasonal affective disorder?", A PILOT STUDY. MED HYPOTHESES., (2012), vol. 78, pages 511 - 5 | - VAN BRUNT EE; SHEPHARD MD; WALL JR; GANONG WF; CLEGG MT., "Penetration of light into the brain of mammals", ANN N Y ACAD SCI, (1964), vol. 117, pages 217 - 24 | - WATERHOUSE J; REILLY T; ATKINSON G; EDWARDS B., "Jetlag: trends and coping strategies", LANCET, (2007), vol. 369, pages 1117 - 29 | - WINGET CM; DEROSHIA CW; MARKLEY CL; HOLLEY DC., "A review of human physiological and performance changes associated with desynchronosis of biological rhythms", AVIAT SPACE ENVIRON MED., (1984), vol. 55, pages 1085 - 1096 | - WRIGHT H; LACK L., "Effect of light wavelength on suppression and phase delay of the melatonin rhythm", CHRONOBIOL INT, (2001), vol. 18, pages 801 - 08 | - ZAWILSKA JB; SKENE DJ; ARENDT J., "Physiology and pharmacology of melatonin in relation to biological rhythms", PHARMACOLOGICAL REPORTS., (2009), vol. 61, pages 383 - 410 |