EP2604538 - Beverage crate with integrated transponder assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 03.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schoeller Technocell GmbH & Co. KG Burg Gretesch 49086 Osnabrück / DE | [2016/22] |
Former [2016/19] | For all designated states Felix Schoeller Supply Chain Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Burg Gretesch 49086 Osnabrück / DE | ||
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Felix Schoeller Supply Chain Technologies GmbH & Co. KG Burg Gretesch 49086 OsnaBrück / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rademacher, Horst Adolf-Kolpingstraße 19 49179 Ostercappeln / DE | 02 /
Suleck, Ingo Blumenhaller Weg 28 49078 Osnabrück / DE | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/19] |
Former [2013/25] | Cohausz & Florack Bleichstraße 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 12190850.3 | 31.10.2012 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | DE201110120862 | 13.12.2011 Original published format: DE102011120862 | [2013/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2604538 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2604538 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/24, G06K19/077 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
B65D1/243 (EP);
G06Q10/10 (EP);
B65D2203/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/29] | Title | German: | Getränkekasten mit integrierter Transponderanordnung | [2013/25] | English: | Beverage crate with integrated transponder assembly | [2013/25] | French: | Caisse à boissons avec agencement de transpondeur intégré | [2013/25] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 04.11.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2012 | AL | 11.05.2016 | BG | 11.05.2016 | CY | 11.05.2016 | CZ | 11.05.2016 | DK | 11.05.2016 | EE | 11.05.2016 | ES | 11.05.2016 | FI | 11.05.2016 | HR | 11.05.2016 | IS | 11.05.2016 | IT | 11.05.2016 | LT | 11.05.2016 | LV | 11.05.2016 | MC | 11.05.2016 | MK | 11.05.2016 | MT | 11.05.2016 | NL | 11.05.2016 | PL | 11.05.2016 | RO | 11.05.2016 | RS | 11.05.2016 | SE | 11.05.2016 | SI | 11.05.2016 | SK | 11.05.2016 | SM | 11.05.2016 | TR | 11.05.2016 | NO | 11.08.2016 | GR | 12.08.2016 | PT | 12.09.2016 | GB | 31.10.2016 | IE | 31.10.2016 | LU | 31.10.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 31.10.2012 | |
BG | 11.05.2016 | ||
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
GB | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 31.10.2016 | ||
LU | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
GB | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 31.10.2016 | ||
LU | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IS | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
MT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
GB | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 31.10.2016 | ||
LU | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
TR | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
GB | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 31.10.2016 | ||
LU | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 31.10.2012 | |
CY | 11.05.2016 | ||
CZ | 11.05.2016 | ||
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
MK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
GB | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 31.10.2016 | ||
LU | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
GB | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 31.10.2016 | ||
LU | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
GB | 31.10.2016 | ||
LU | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
MC | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SI | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
GB | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
SM | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
PL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
SK | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 11.05.2016 | |
DK | 11.05.2016 | ||
EE | 11.05.2016 | ||
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RO | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 11.05.2016 | |
ES | 11.05.2016 | ||
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
IT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
SE | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
GR | 12.08.2016 | ||
PT | 12.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 11.05.2016 | |
FI | 11.05.2016 | ||
HR | 11.05.2016 | ||
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
LV | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
RS | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 11.05.2016 | |
LT | 11.05.2016 | ||
NL | 11.05.2016 | ||
NO | 11.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 11.05.2016 | |
NO | 11.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102006038883 (OBERLAND ENGINEERING GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,8,12,15 * the whole document *; | [XYI]DE4313049 (HOEFFGEN MICHAEL L [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,8,12,15 * the whole document * [Y] 1-3,6,7,11 [I] 14; | [Y]DE4439914 (MUELLER GOTTHARD [DE]) [Y] 1,6,7,11 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1626364 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1424651 (D W PLASTICS NV [BE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2008116005 (CSP TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 2,3 * abstract * * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0036] *; | [A]US2441227 (PINELES BERNARD M) [A] 9,10,13 * the whole document * |