EP2562988 - Open architecture communications in a gaming network [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.03.2017 [2017/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IGT 6355 S. Buffalo Drive Las Vegas, NV 89113 / US | [2013/52] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states IGT 9295 Prototype Way Reno, Nevada 89511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brosnan, William 4751 W. Creek Ridge Trail RENO, NV Nevada 89509 / US | 02 /
LeMay, Steven G. 5398 South Elk River Road RENO, NV Nevada 89511 / US | 03 /
Cockerille, Warner 414 Abbay Way SPARKS, NV Nevada 89431 / US | 04 /
Nelson, Dwayne 5488 Aleman Drive LAS VEGAS, NV Nevada 89113 / US | 05 /
Breckner, Robert 14620 South Quiet Meadows RENO, NV Nevada 89511 / US | [2013/09] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Cerbaro, Elena, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 12191205.9 | 18.06.2003 | [2013/09] | Priority number, date | US20020184451 | 26.06.2002 Original published format: US 184451 | [2013/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2562988 | Date: | 27.02.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, G07F17/32, H04L29/08 | [2013/09] | CPC: |
G07F17/32 (EP,US);
G07F17/3223 (EP,US);
G07F17/323 (EP,US);
G07F17/3239 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04L67/131 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/09] | Title | German: | Kommunikationen mit offener Architektur in einem Spielenetzwerk | [2013/09] | English: | Open architecture communications in a gaming network | [2013/09] | French: | Communications à architecture ouverte dans un réseau de jeu | [2013/09] | Examination procedure | 27.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/40] | 27.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/11] | 06.02.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.05.2017 | 08.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03761963.2 / EP1516476 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030761963) is 09.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5761647 (BOUSHY JOHN MICHAEL [US]) [A] 1-19 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 44 * * column 5, lines 1-13 * * column 6, line 46 - column 7, line 12 * * column 15, lines 23-38 * * column 20, line 58 - column 21, line 8 *; | [A]US2002002075 (ROWE RICK [US]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0010] , [0014] , [0015] , [0023] - [0025] * * paragraphs [0130] - [0135] - [0138] , [0178] , [0184] *; | [X]WO0209052 (INT GAME TECH [US]) [X] 1-19 * page 2, lines 4-35 * * page 3, line 26 - page 6, line 8 * * page 7, lines 14-19 * * page 8, lines 12-32 * * page 10, line 1 - page 11, line 26 * * page 12, lines 11-16 * * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 16 * * page 16, lines 5-10 *; | [X]WO0217251 (INT GAME TECH [US], et al) [X] 1-19 * page 5, line 3 - page 7, line 5; figures 1,3 * * page 12, line 24 - page 13, line 4 * * page 13, line 18 - page 14, line 31 * * page 15, line 21 - page 16, line 12 * * page 17, lines 20,21 * * page 19, line 28 - page 20, line 30 *; | [A]US2002052230 (MARTINEK MICHAEL G [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] * * paragraphs [0030] , [0031] , [0037] * * paragraphs [0059] , [0060] ** paragraphs [0118] , [0121] - [0123] - [0130] , [0135] , [0137] *; | [A]US2002071557 (NGUYEN BINH T [US]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0015] * * paragraphs [0022] , [0041] , [0046] , [0056] * | by applicant | US19990414659 |