EP2594402 - Paper used in an inkjet printer, inkjet printer, and preliminary ejection method for an inkjet printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishishinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [2013/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Kiyoshi c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
Kobayashi, Naoki c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12191432.9 | 06.11.2012 | [2013/21] | Priority number, date | JP20110249414 | 15.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011249414 | [2013/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2594402 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2594402 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/165 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
B41J2/16526 (EP,US);
B41J2/215 (US);
B41J2/16585 (EP,US);
B41M5/502 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Title | German: | In einem Tintenstrahldrucker verwendetes Papier, Tintenstrahldrucker und Vorauswurfsverfahren für einen Tintenstrahldrucker | [2013/21] | English: | Paper used in an inkjet printer, inkjet printer, and preliminary ejection method for an inkjet printer | [2013/21] | French: | Papier utilisé dans une imprimante à jet d'encre, imprimante à jet d'encre et procédé d'éjection préliminaire pour une imprimante à jet d'encre | [2013/21] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 10.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2012 | AL | 11.06.2014 | AT | 11.06.2014 | BE | 11.06.2014 | BG | 11.06.2014 | CY | 11.06.2014 | CZ | 11.06.2014 | DK | 11.06.2014 | EE | 11.06.2014 | ES | 11.06.2014 | HR | 11.06.2014 | IT | 11.06.2014 | LT | 11.06.2014 | LV | 11.06.2014 | MC | 11.06.2014 | MK | 11.06.2014 | MT | 11.06.2014 | NL | 11.06.2014 | PL | 11.06.2014 | RO | 11.06.2014 | RS | 11.06.2014 | SE | 11.06.2014 | SI | 11.06.2014 | SK | 11.06.2014 | SM | 11.06.2014 | TR | 11.06.2014 | NO | 11.09.2014 | GR | 12.09.2014 | IS | 11.10.2014 | PT | 13.10.2014 | IE | 06.11.2014 | LU | 06.11.2014 | FR | 01.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.11.2012 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MK | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
TR | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 06.11.2012 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
SM | 11.06.2014 | ||
TR | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 06.11.2012 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
MT | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
TR | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 06.11.2012 | |
AT | 11.06.2014 | ||
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
BG | 11.06.2014 | ||
CY | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.11.2014 | ||
FR | 01.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
IE | 06.11.2014 | ||
LU | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SI | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
MC | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
BE | 11.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
LU | 06.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
DK | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
IT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 11.06.2014 | |
CZ | 11.06.2014 | ||
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
NL | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
IS | 11.10.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
PL | 11.06.2014 | ||
RO | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
PT | 13.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CZ | 11.06.2014 | |
EE | 11.06.2014 | ||
ES | 11.06.2014 | ||
HR | 11.06.2014 | ||
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
SK | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | HR | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
RS | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | HR | 11.06.2014 | |
LT | 11.06.2014 | ||
LV | 11.06.2014 | ||
SE | 11.06.2014 | ||
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
GR | 12.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | LT | 11.06.2014 | |
NO | 11.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | LT | 11.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4743130 (KATAGIRI KOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0798123 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]US2005162452 (KACHI YASUHIKO [JP]) [Y] 9-13 * paragraph [0076] *; | [A]US2006055715 (NAKAHARA YASUNORI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [AD]JP2007144792 (CANON KK) [AD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [XAYI]WO2011007487 (PHOTO CRAFT CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,8 * the whole document * [A] 14,15 [Y] 9-13 [I] 2-6 | by applicant | JP2007144792 |