Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] |
16.05.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
05.03.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
29.11.2013 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
18.10.2013 | Change - classification | published on 20.11.2013 [2013/47] |
17.05.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |
15.04.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | |
15.04.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.04.2013 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.04.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
12.11.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid |