EP2574882 - Magnetic sensor with high and low resolution tracks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Timken US Corporation 59 Field Street Torrington, CT 06790 / US | [2013/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lacroix, Mark, E. 182 Old Chesterfield Road Winchester, NH 03470 / US | [2013/14] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12191633.2 | 12.01.2007 | [2013/14] | Priority number, date | US20060758333P | 12.01.2006 Original published format: US 758333 P | [2013/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2574882 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/14 | [2013/14] | CPC: |
G01D5/145 (EP,US);
G01D5/14 (KR);
G01D5/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/14] | Title | German: | Magnetischer Sensor mit hoch- und niedrigauflösenden Spuren | [2013/14] | English: | Magnetic sensor with high and low resolution tracks | [2013/14] | French: | Capteur magnétique à pistes haute et basse résolution | [2013/14] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 29.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/40] | 16.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2014/40] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07709718.6 / EP1974185 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070709718) is 09.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   10.04.2013 | 31.01.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1568971 (ZF LENKSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1,4,6,7,9; claims 1,3 *; | [A]US2005127901 (JOHNSON THEODIS [US]) [A] 1-6 * figures 1B,3A,3C; claims 1,7 * |