EP2617846 - A cast nickel-iron-base alloy component and process of forming a cast nickel-iron-base alloy component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goller, George Albert 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 02 /
Laylock, Matthew 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 03 /
Razum, Joseph C. 300 Galington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 04 /
Feng, Ganjiang 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/30] | Szary, Anne Catherine GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 12191913.8 | 09.11.2012 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | US201113299823 | 18.11.2011 Original published format: US201113299823 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2617846 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2617846 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/05, C22F1/10, F01D5/00, F01D9/02 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
C21D1/00 (EP,US);
C22C19/056 (EP,US);
C22F1/10 (EP,US);
F05D2240/12 (EP,US);
F05D2300/111 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Legierung auf Nickel-Eisen-Basis und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Legierung auf Nickel-Eisen-Basis | [2013/30] | English: | A cast nickel-iron-base alloy component and process of forming a cast nickel-iron-base alloy component | [2013/30] | French: | Composant d'alliage à base de nickel-fer et procédé de formation d'un composant d'alliage à base de nickel-fer | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 11.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 09.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/07] | 28.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP2465959 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [XP] 1-4,6 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0018] , [0030] , [0032] *; | [A]EP2295611 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1469095 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |