EP2591749 - Instrument to selectively rotate a medical tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Moro, Sergio Via Monte Cavallo, 11/A 33084 Cordenons (PN) / IT | [2013/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Piazzale Cavedalis 6/2 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 12192275.1 | 12.11.2012 | [2013/20] | Priority number, date | IT2011UD00179 | 10.11.2011 Original published format: IT UD20110179 | [2013/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2591749 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2591749 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00, A61B17/88, B25B15/04 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
A61C8/0089 (EP);
B25B13/463 (EP);
B25B23/1427 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Instrument um ein medizinisches Werkzeug wahlweise zu rotieren | [2013/20] | English: | Instrument to selectively rotate a medical tool | [2013/20] | French: | Instrument medical avec sens de rotation sélectionnable | [2013/20] | Examination procedure | 06.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/27] | 17.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2004096069 (PRECIMED SA [CH], et al) [X] 1,2 * page 2, lines 1-3 * * page 3, lines 7-15; figure 1 * [I] 3; | [X]FR1478557 (RAPHAËL CHERCHEVE) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]DE202007004198U (HELMUT KLINGEL GMBH CNC ZERSPA [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2005032397 (ZL MICRODENT ATTACHMENT GMBH & [DE], et al) [X] 6-9 * figures 1,2 * * the whole document *; | [XA]DE10305175 (HERBST BREMER GOLDSCHLAEGEREI [DE]) [X] 6-9 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [X]US6162053 (HOLLANDER BRUCE L [US]) [X] 6-8 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1731114 (BAZZURRO ANDREA [IT]) [X] 6-8 * the whole document *; | [X]US4517865 (HUANG YUNG-LUNG [TW]) [X] 6-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2006243108 | DE202007004198U | US1944171 |