EP2566263 - Method and telecommunications network for controlling activation of at least one terminal in a machine-type communication application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Maanplein 55 2516 CK The Hague / NL | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [2016/50] |
Former [2013/10] | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Maanplein 55 2516 CK The Hague / NL | ||
For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast -Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busropan, Bryan Jerrel Zalmforelvijver 3 Den Haag 2492 MR / NL | 02 /
van Loon, Johannes Maria Makorehout 31 2719 JE Zoetermeer / NL | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 25110 3001 HC Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2013/10] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 12192898.0 | 05.10.2010 | [2013/10] | Priority number, date | EP20090172248 | 05.10.2009 Original published format: EP 09172248 | [2013/10] | Previously filed application, date | WO2010EP64797 | 05.10.2010 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2566263 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2566263 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2566263 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W68/00, H04W76/02, H04W4/00, // H04W4/06, H04W84/18 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
H04W4/70 (EP,US);
H04W68/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/06 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/17] | H04W68/00, H04W76/02, H04W4/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/10] | H04W68/00, H04W76/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2013/10] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Kommunikationsnetzwerk zum Steuern der Aktivierung von mindestens einem Endgerät in einer maschinenartigen Kommunikationsanwendung | [2013/10] | English: | Method and telecommunications network for controlling activation of at least one terminal in a machine-type communication application | [2013/10] | French: | Procédé et réseau de télécommunications pour le contrôle de l'activation d'au moins un terminal dans une application de communication de type machine | [2016/50] |
Former [2013/10] | Procédé et réseau de télécommunications pour le contrôle de lýactivation dýau moins un terminal dans une application de communication de type machine | Examination procedure | 23.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 01.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10760701.2 / EP2486767 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100760701) is 23.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.10.2010 | AL | 14.12.2016 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | BG | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 05.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
TR | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 05.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 05.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 05.10.2010 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/14] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/01] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | HR | 14.12.2016 | |
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9957927 (ERICSSON INC [US]) [X] 1,2,10-12,15 * page 4, line 25 - page 5, line 6 * * page 5, line 21 - page 7, line 10 *; | [Y]US2006046762 (YOON SEUNG-IL [KR], et al) [Y] 4-6,13 * paragraphs [0013] , [0021] ** paragraphs [0027] , [0028] *; | [IY]WO2008031268 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al) [I] 1,2,10,11,13,15 * page 6, line 9 - line 33 * * page 8 - page 10 * [Y] 4-6; | [XY]US2008153521 (BENAOUDA ABDELKADER [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10-12,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0011] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0074] - [0076] * [Y] 4-6,13 |