EP2733236 - Two-layer ceramic coating system having an outer porous layer and depressions therein [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2015 [2015/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ahmad, Fathi Moselstr. 1 41564 Kaarst / DE | 02 /
Stamm, Werner Kahlenberg 18 45481 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | 03 /
Klein, Karsten Kladower Damm 282d 14089 Berlin / DE | 04 /
Schumann, Eckart Scharpenberg 113 45468 Mülheim an der Ruhr / DE | [2014/21] | Application number, filing date | 12192924.4 | 16.11.2012 | [2014/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2733236 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C23C30/00, C23C4/10, C23C4/18 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
C23C30/00 (EP);
C23C4/11 (EP);
C23C4/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zweilagiges keramisches Schichtsystem mit äusserer poröser Schicht und Vertiefungen darin | [2014/21] | English: | Two-layer ceramic coating system having an outer porous layer and depressions therein | [2014/21] | French: | Système de couche céramique double couche avec couche extérieure poreuse et évidements à l'intérieur | [2014/21] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2012 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 22.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/27] | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/27] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP1247941 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4-10 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,11-14; | [XA]EP1283278 (SIEMENS WESTINGHOUSE POWER [US]) [X] 1-10,12-14 * figure 1 * [A] 11; | [XA]WO2011103927 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-10 * claims 1,2, 13, 18, 19, 20, 22, 25 * [A] 2,3,11-14; | [XA]WO2007112783 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-6,10 * page 10, line 25 - page 11, line 2; figures 1,2; claims 1-17 * [A] 2,3,7-9,11-14; | [IA]US2003211354 (SUBRAMANIAN RAMESH [US], et al) [I] 1,4,5,7-10 * page 2, paragraph 19 - paragraph 20; figure 2 * * page 3, paragraph 28 - page 4, paragraph 28; claim 13 * [A] 2,3,6,11-14; | [A]EP1564537 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2009131 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2275645 (ROLLS ROYCE CORP [US]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP1204776 | EP1306454 | EP1319729 | WO9967435 | WO0044949 | US6024792 | EP0892090 | EP0486489 | EP0786017 | EP0412397 |