10.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
29.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
12.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2019 [2019/33] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
05.04.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.05.2019 [2019/19] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
08.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.2019 [2019/11] |
01.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.03.2019 [2019/10] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
18.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2019 [2019/08] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
16.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] |
09.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] |
02.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] |
19.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] |
27.04.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
19.04.2018 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
19.04.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.04.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
29.03.2018 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
28.01.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.12.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
22.12.2017 |
Change - classification |
published on 24.01.2018 [2018/04] |
27.10.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2017 |
Change - representative |
|
28.10.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.11.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.01.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
13.01.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
25.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.05.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
30.05.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
30.05.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
28.06.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 31.07.2013 [2013/31] |
21.05.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.05.2013 [2013/21] |