Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013073904 | Global Dossier | 23.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20110119879 | 16.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9983664 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2018 | B2 | US2013120295 | 16.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20110119879 | 16.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101888457B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2018 | B1 | KR20130054073 | 24.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20110119879 | 16.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103116438B | Global Dossier | 18.09.2018 | B | CN103116438 | 22.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20110119879 | 16.11.2011 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2595042 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | B1 | EP2595042 | 02.07.2014 | A3 | EP2595042 | 22.05.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20110119879 | 16.11.2011 |