EP2594498 - Labelling machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sidel S.p.A. Con Socio Unico Via La Spezia 241/A Parma / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | For all designated states Sidel S.p.a. Con Socio Unico Via La Spezia 241/A Parma / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Giuliani, Mattia c/o SIDEL S.p.A. CON SOCIO UNICO Via La Spezia, 241/A 43100 PARMA / IT | 02 /
Ferri, Marco c/o SIDEL S.p.A. CON SOCIO UNICO Via La Spezia, 241/A 43100 PARMA / IT | [2013/21] | Representative(s) | D'Angelo, Fabio, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/49] |
Former [2013/23] | Bergadano, Mirko, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 12193122.4 | 16.11.2012 | [2013/21] | Priority number, date | IT2011TO01063 | 18.11.2011 Original published format: IT TO20111063 | [2013/21] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2594498 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2594498 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65C9/00 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
B65C9/00 (EP);
B65C9/0062 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/21] | Title | German: | Maschine zum Etikettieren | [2013/21] | English: | Labelling machine | [2013/21] | French: | Machine d'étiquetage | [2013/21] | Examination procedure | 23.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 16.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.04.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 05.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.11.2012 | AL | 30.07.2014 | AT | 30.07.2014 | BE | 30.07.2014 | CY | 30.07.2014 | CZ | 30.07.2014 | DK | 30.07.2014 | EE | 30.07.2014 | ES | 30.07.2014 | FI | 30.07.2014 | HR | 30.07.2014 | IT | 30.07.2014 | LT | 30.07.2014 | LV | 30.07.2014 | MC | 30.07.2014 | MK | 30.07.2014 | MT | 30.07.2014 | NL | 30.07.2014 | PL | 30.07.2014 | RO | 30.07.2014 | RS | 30.07.2014 | SE | 30.07.2014 | SI | 30.07.2014 | SK | 30.07.2014 | SM | 30.07.2014 | TR | 30.07.2014 | BG | 30.10.2014 | NO | 30.10.2014 | GR | 31.10.2014 | IE | 16.11.2014 | LU | 16.11.2014 | IS | 30.11.2014 | PT | 02.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MK | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
RS | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
SM | 30.07.2014 | ||
TR | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IE | 16.11.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
RS | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
SM | 30.07.2014 | ||
TR | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IE | 16.11.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
MT | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
RS | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
TR | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IE | 16.11.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 16.11.2012 | |
AT | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
RS | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IE | 16.11.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
RS | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IE | 16.11.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
RS | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IE | 16.11.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
RS | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
RS | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
LU | 16.11.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
CZ | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
EE | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
RS | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
SK | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RO | 30.07.2014 | ||
RS | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
HR | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
LV | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
RS | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
IS | 30.11.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
PL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 30.07.2014 | |
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BG | 30.10.2014 | ||
NO | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 30.07.2014 | |
LT | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 30.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102009035880 (KHS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0023]; figure 1 *; | [A]DE29724886U (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0032]; figure 4 *; | [A]WO2005068302 (KRONES AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP2133275 (SIDEL HOLDINGS & TECHNOLOGY SA [CH]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1820735 (KHS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE3134661 | EP1412279 |