EP2639817 - Method of fabricating a single-poly floating-gate memory device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states eMemory Technology Inc. Room 305, No. 47 Park Avenue II Rd. Hsinchu Science Park Hsin-Chu 30075 / TW | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsu, Te-Hsun No. 6, Aly. 12, Ln. 219 Yuanshan Rd., Zhudong Township 310 Hsinchu County / TW | 02 /
Chen, Hsin-Ming 10F.-1, No. 12, Ln. 59 Jiangong 1st Rd., East Dist. 300 Hsinchu City / TW | 03 /
Ching, Wen-Hao 6F., No. 42, Sanchong Rd., Zhudong Township 310 Hsinchu County / TW | 04 /
Chen, Wei-Ren No. 6, Ln. 157, Zili S. Rd., Pingtung City 900 Pingtung County / TW | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Krauns, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/38] | Krauns, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12193176.0 | 19.11.2012 | [2013/38] | Priority number, date | US201261609376P | 12.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261609376 P | [2013/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2639817 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/28, H01L21/336, H01L27/115, H01L29/423, H01L29/788, G11C16/04 | [2013/38] | CPC: |
H01L29/66825 (EP);
G11C16/0425 (EP);
H01L29/40114 (EP);
H01L29/7883 (EP);
H01L29/7885 (EP);
H10B41/41 (EP);
H10B41/60 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen einer Floating-gate-Speichervorrichtung mit einer einzelnen Polysiliziumschicht | [2013/38] | English: | Method of fabricating a single-poly floating-gate memory device | [2013/38] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif de mémoire à grille flottante ayant une seule couche de polysilicium | [2013/38] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 03.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/28] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6255169 (LI XIAO-YU [US], et al); | [A]US2010149874 (LEUNG WINGYU [US], et al); | [XI]US2010163956 (LEE HYUNG-KEUN [KR]); | [A]US2010329016 (TANIGUCHI YASUHIRO [JP]) | by applicant | US6678190 |