EP2597541 - Method for managing the synchronisation of a distributed system for recording time-stamped events [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.08.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35, rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [2017/50] |
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states Schneider Electric Industries SAS 35 rue Joseph Monier 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eyraud, Annick 1180 Chemin des Rastines 06600 Antibes / FR | 02 /
Chevalier, Laurent 326 Avenue Font Roubert 06510 Mougin / FR | 03 /
Arod, Etienne 48 Chemin des Autrichiens - Bât H1 - Résidence St Jean 06600 Antibes / FR | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Dufresne, Thierry, et al Schneider Electric Industries SAS Service Propriété Industrielle 35 rue Joseph Monier - CS 30323 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cedex / FR | [2013/22] | Application number, filing date | 12193539.9 | 21.11.2012 | [2013/22] | Priority number, date | FR20110060754 | 24.11.2011 Original published format: FR 1160754 | [2013/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2597541 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2597541 | Date: | 02.11.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2597541 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G05B19/05, G05B19/418, G06F1/12 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP);
G05B19/052 (EP);
G05B19/418 (EP);
G05B2219/32407 (EP);
G05B2219/34413 (EP);
Y02P90/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/51] |
Former [2013/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steuerung der Synchronisation eines verteilten Aufzeichnungssystems von mit Zeitstempel versehenen Ereignissen | [2014/31] | English: | Method for managing the synchronisation of a distributed system for recording time-stamped events | [2014/31] | French: | Procédé de gestion de la synchronisation d'un système distribué d'enregistrement d'événements horodatés | [2013/22] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.11.2016 | Examination requested [2016/51] | 17.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 14.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2012 | AL | 13.12.2017 | AT | 13.12.2017 | CY | 13.12.2017 | CZ | 13.12.2017 | DK | 13.12.2017 | EE | 13.12.2017 | ES | 13.12.2017 | FI | 13.12.2017 | HR | 13.12.2017 | LT | 13.12.2017 | LV | 13.12.2017 | MC | 13.12.2017 | MK | 13.12.2017 | MT | 13.12.2017 | NL | 13.12.2017 | PL | 13.12.2017 | PT | 13.12.2017 | RO | 13.12.2017 | RS | 13.12.2017 | SE | 13.12.2017 | SI | 13.12.2017 | SK | 13.12.2017 | SM | 13.12.2017 | TR | 13.12.2017 | BG | 13.03.2018 | NO | 13.03.2018 | GR | 14.03.2018 | IS | 13.04.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.11.2012 | |
AT | 13.12.2017 | ||
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MK | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 21.11.2012 | |
AT | 13.12.2017 | ||
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
TR | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MC | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SI | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
DK | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
MT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RO | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 13.12.2017 | |
CY | 13.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
IS | 13.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 13.12.2017 | |
CZ | 13.12.2017 | ||
EE | 13.12.2017 | ||
ES | 13.12.2017 | ||
FI | 13.12.2017 | ||
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
PL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
SK | 13.12.2017 | ||
SM | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
NL | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
LV | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
BG | 13.03.2018 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
HR | 13.12.2017 | ||
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
RS | 13.12.2017 | ||
SE | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | ||
GR | 14.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 13.12.2017 | |
LT | 13.12.2017 | ||
NO | 13.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2010272071 (HITACHI INT ELECTRIC INC) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] , [0008] , [0019] * * paragraphs [0020] , [0030] * * claim 1 *; | [A] - Meinberg Funkuhren GmbH & Co. KG, "Schaltsekunden und deren Auswertung durch Funkuhren und NTP", Internet, (20051030), URL: http://www.meinberg.de/german/info/leap-second.htm, (20120802), XP002681196 [A] 1-8 * pages 4,5 * | [A] - Brandt, J., "Verteilte Systeme - 3. Übung Sommersemester 2011", Technische Universität Braunschweig, Institut für Betriebssysteme und Rechnerverbund, (20110607), URL: https://www.ibr.cs.tu-bs.de/courses/ss11/vs/material/vs-ss11-u3-folien.pdf?lang=de, (20120802), XP002681197 [A] 1-8 * page 7 * | by applicant | US2011066598 | EP1126334 |