EP2566237 - Inter base station handover methods, base station, and communication terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/10] | Inter base station handover method, radio communication system, DRX control method, base station, and communication terminal | ||
[2014/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Futaki, Hisashi c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
Lee, Jinsock c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | [2013/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/10] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12193549.8 | 01.02.2008 | [2013/10] | Priority number, date | JP20070025873 | 05.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007025873 | [2013/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2566237 | Date: | 06.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2566237 | Date: | 27.03.2013 | [2013/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2566237 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/02, H04W76/04, H04W36/00 | [2014/11] | CPC: |
H04W52/0212 (EP,US);
H04W52/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/0064 (EP,KR,US);
H04W36/165 (EP,KR,US);
H04W52/0216 (EP,US);
H04W76/28 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/13] | H04W36/00, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/10] | Title | German: | Verfahren für Handover von Basisstation zu Basisstation, Basisstation und Kommunikationsendgerät | [2014/11] | English: | Inter base station handover methods, base station, and communication terminal | [2014/11] | French: | Procédés de transfert intercellulaire inter-station de base, station de base et terminal de communication | [2014/11] |
Former [2013/10] | Verfahren für Handover von Basisstation zu Basisstation, Funkkommunikationssystem, DRX-Steuerungsverfahren, Basisstation und Kommunikationsendgerät | ||
Former [2013/10] | Inter base station handover method, radio communication system, DRX control method, base station, and communication terminal | ||
Former [2013/10] | Procédé de transfert intercellulaire inter-station de base, système de radiocommunication, procédé de contrôle DRX, station de base et terminal de communication | Examination procedure | 26.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 03.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08710722.3 / EP2120479 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080710722) is 02.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2008 | AT | 20.08.2014 | BE | 20.08.2014 | CY | 20.08.2014 | CZ | 20.08.2014 | DK | 20.08.2014 | EE | 20.08.2014 | ES | 20.08.2014 | FI | 20.08.2014 | HR | 20.08.2014 | LT | 20.08.2014 | LV | 20.08.2014 | MC | 20.08.2014 | MT | 20.08.2014 | NL | 20.08.2014 | PL | 20.08.2014 | RO | 20.08.2014 | SE | 20.08.2014 | SI | 20.08.2014 | SK | 20.08.2014 | TR | 20.08.2014 | BG | 20.11.2014 | NO | 20.11.2014 | GR | 21.11.2014 | IS | 20.12.2014 | PT | 22.12.2014 | IE | 01.02.2015 | LU | 01.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
MT | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
BE | 20.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
IE | 01.02.2015 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SI | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
MC | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
LU | 01.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
PL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
CZ | 20.08.2014 | ||
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
EE | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
SK | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
DK | 20.08.2014 | ||
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
RO | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
NL | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 20.08.2014 | |
ES | 20.08.2014 | ||
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
HR | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
LV | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
IS | 20.12.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
GR | 21.11.2014 | ||
PT | 22.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 20.08.2014 | |
FI | 20.08.2014 | ||
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
BG | 20.11.2014 | ||
NO | 20.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 20.08.2014 | |
LT | 20.08.2014 | ||
SE | 20.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 20.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2005107377 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [A]WO2006018670 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) |