EP2617427 - Cell carrier and cell carrier containment devices containing regenerative cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cytori Therapeutics, Inc. 3020 Callan Road San Diego, CA 92101 / US | [2016/33] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Cytori Therapeutics, Inc. 3020 Callan Road San Diego, CA 92101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hedrick, Marc, H. 2345 Jennifer Lane Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | 02 /
Fraser, John, K. 11610 Spruce Run Drive San Diego, CA 92131 / US | 03 /
Riley, Susan, Lynn 11337 Seda Place San Diego, CA 92124 / US | 04 /
Tai, Joseph 6740 Top Gun Street San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Sharples, Andrew John EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [2016/33] |
Former [2014/46] | EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2013/30] | Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | Application number, filing date | 12193602.5 | 01.07.2004 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | US20040554455P | 19.03.2004 Original published format: US 554455 P | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617427 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2617427 | Date: | 17.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/28, A61K35/32 | [2016/09] | CPC: |
A61K35/32 (EP,KR);
C12M1/00 (KR);
A61K35/28 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
C12M3/00 (KR);
C12N5/00 (KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | A61K35/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/33] |
Former [2013/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zellträger und Zellträgeraufbewahrungsvorrichtungen zur Aufbewahrung regenerativer Zellen | [2013/30] | English: | Cell carrier and cell carrier containment devices containing regenerative cells | [2013/30] | French: | Support de cellules et dispositifs de confinement de support cellulaire contenant des cellules régénératives | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 25.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04756624.5 / EP1743021 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040756624) is 16.11.2010 | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.07.2004 | CY | 17.08.2016 | CZ | 17.08.2016 | EE | 17.08.2016 | IT | 17.08.2016 | MC | 17.08.2016 | PL | 17.08.2016 | RO | 17.08.2016 | SI | 17.08.2016 | SK | 17.08.2016 | TR | 17.08.2016 | BG | 17.11.2016 | GR | 18.11.2016 | PT | 19.12.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | HU | 01.07.2004 | |
CY | 17.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 01.07.2004 | |
CZ | 17.08.2016 | ||
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
MC | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SI | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/32] | CZ | 17.08.2016 | |
EE | 17.08.2016 | ||
IT | 17.08.2016 | ||
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
RO | 17.08.2016 | ||
SK | 17.08.2016 | ||
BG | 17.11.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/12] | IT | 17.08.2016 | |
PL | 17.08.2016 | ||
GR | 18.11.2016 | ||
PT | 19.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | IT | 17.08.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO03024215 (MACROPORE BIOSURGERY INC [US]); | [T]WO2006014156 (MACROPORE BIOSURGERY INC [US], et al) | by applicant | US5015247 | US5716416 | US5919234 | US6001642 | US6033438 | US6143293 | US6238908 | US6269716 | US6280473 | US6343531 | US6391059 | US6477923 | US2002182211 | US6531146 | US6635064 | US6653146 | US6673362 | US20020242094 | US20020316127 | US20020325728 |