EP2597268 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ADJUSTING CLEARANCES IN TURBINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/22] | Systems and methods for adjusting clearances in turbines | ||
[2018/27] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.06.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.04.2019 [2019/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chillar, Rahul 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA Georgia 30339 / US | 02 /
Calleros, Erwing 4200 Wildwood Parkway Atlanta, GA Georgia 30339 / US | 03 /
Rajesh, Prabhakaran Sarawwathi JFWTC, Plot 122, EPIP, Phase ll, Hoodi Villlage Whitefiled Road 560066 Bangalore, Karnataka / IN | 04 /
Pena, Ezio 16 Rue Jules Ferry Cravanche 90300 Territoire de Belfor / FR | 05 /
Antoine, Nicolas 4 Rue des Lilas Montreux-vieux 68210 Haut-Rhin / FR | 06 /
Da Costa, Jose Quintino 8B Rue de Stade 25120 Pont de Roide / FR | [2013/22] | Representative(s) | Fischer, Michael Maria, et al General Electric Technology GmbH GE Corporate Intellectual Property Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/22] | Cleary, Fidelma GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation-Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12193659.5 | 21.11.2012 | [2013/22] | Priority number, date | US201113302372 | 22.11.2011 Original published format: US201113302372 | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2597268 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2597268 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D11/24 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
F01D11/24 (EP,US);
F05D2260/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/51] |
Former [2013/22] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR LAUFSPALTEINSTELLUNG BEI EINER TURBINE | [2018/27] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR ADJUSTING CLEARANCES IN TURBINES | [2018/27] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS PERMETTANT DE RÉGLER LES JEUXS DANS LES TURBINES | [2018/27] |
Former [2013/22] | Systeme und Verfahren zur Laufspalteinstellung bei einer Turbine | ||
Former [2013/22] | Systems and methods for adjusting clearances in turbines | ||
Former [2013/22] | Systèmes et procédés permettant de régler les jeux dans les turbines | Examination procedure | 21.11.2012 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 31.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.11.2017 | Examination requested [2017/51] | 04.06.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/15] | 22.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2019/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2018 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5630702 (MARMILIC ROBERT [CH], et al) [X] 1,7-9,11 * column 1, line 8 - line 47 * * column 3, line 52 - column 4, line 57; figures 1-4 * [I] 2-6,12-16; | [A]US2002055330 (SCHROEDER TROY JOSEPH [US], et al) [A] 1,6,11,16* figures 1, 2 *; | [X]EP1777373 (SNECMA [FR]) [X] 1,10,11 * paragraph [0034]; figure 3 *; | [A]DE102006012977 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-5,11-15 * paragraphs [0003] , [0 25] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-3 * |