EP2599634 - Laser light irradiating system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2013/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yamamoto, Kazutaka c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/17] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/23] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstraße 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12193717.1 | 22.11.2012 | [2013/23] | Priority number, date | JP20110261166 | 30.11.2011 Original published format: JP 2011261166 | [2013/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2599634 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2599634 | Date: | 22.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/475, B65G1/137, B41J2/47 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
B41J2/473 (EP,US);
B41J11/008 (US);
B41J2/4753 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | Laserlichtbestrahlungssystem | [2013/23] | English: | Laser light irradiating system | [2013/23] | French: | Système d'irradiation de lumière laser | [2013/23] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/23] | 10.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.11.2012 | AL | 22.04.2015 | AT | 22.04.2015 | BE | 22.04.2015 | BG | 22.04.2015 | CY | 22.04.2015 | CZ | 22.04.2015 | DK | 22.04.2015 | EE | 22.04.2015 | ES | 22.04.2015 | FI | 22.04.2015 | HR | 22.04.2015 | IT | 22.04.2015 | LT | 22.04.2015 | LV | 22.04.2015 | MC | 22.04.2015 | MK | 22.04.2015 | MT | 22.04.2015 | NL | 22.04.2015 | PL | 22.04.2015 | RO | 22.04.2015 | RS | 22.04.2015 | SE | 22.04.2015 | SI | 22.04.2015 | SK | 22.04.2015 | SM | 22.04.2015 | TR | 22.04.2015 | NO | 22.07.2015 | GR | 23.07.2015 | IS | 22.08.2015 | PT | 24.08.2015 | IE | 22.11.2015 | LU | 22.11.2015 | CH | 30.11.2015 | LI | 30.11.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 22.11.2012 | |
AT | 22.04.2015 | ||
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
BG | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MK | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
TR | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 22.11.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 22.11.2012 | |
AT | 22.04.2015 | ||
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
BG | 22.04.2015 | ||
CY | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
MT | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SE | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
SM | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 22.11.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
IE | 22.11.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
BE | 22.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
CH | 30.11.2015 | ||
LI | 30.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
LU | 22.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
MC | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SI | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
IT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
CZ | 22.04.2015 | ||
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
PL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RO | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
SK | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
EE | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
DK | 22.04.2015 | ||
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 22.04.2015 | |
ES | 22.04.2015 | ||
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
IS | 22.08.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 22.04.2015 | |
FI | 22.04.2015 | ||
HR | 22.04.2015 | ||
LT | 22.04.2015 | ||
LV | 22.04.2015 | ||
NL | 22.04.2015 | ||
RS | 22.04.2015 | ||
NO | 22.07.2015 | ||
GR | 23.07.2015 | ||
PT | 24.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 22.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XDI]US2008192618 (NAKATA YOSHIKO [JP], et al) [XD] 1,5,9,10 * paragraphs [0073] - [0083] - [0160] , [0161] * [I] 2-4,6,7; | [D]JP2008194905 (RICOH KK); | [A]JP2011025508 (TOYO KANETSU SOLUTIONS KK) [A] 1* the whole document * | by applicant | JP2008194905 |