17.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] |
13.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] |
06.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.08.2018 [2018/32] |
29.06.2018 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
15.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.07.2018 [2018/29] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
20.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] |
13.01.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.02.2017 [2017/07] |
16.12.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
04.11.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2016 [2016/49] |
14.10.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
14.10.2016 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 16.11.2016 [2016/46] |
16.09.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.10.2016 [2016/42] |
26.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] |
19.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
19.08.2016 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 21.09.2016 [2016/38] |
12.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.09.2016 [2016/37] |
05.08.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] |
22.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] |
01.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
27.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2016 [2016/26] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
13.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] |
06.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
22.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
15.04.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
06.11.2015 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
23.10.2015 |
Change - divisional application(s) |
published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] |
19.10.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.10.2015 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
16.10.2015 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.06.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.06.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
12.06.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
08.05.2015 |
Change - German title |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
08.05.2015 |
Change - French title |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
30.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.01.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.12.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
19.12.2014 |
Change - French title |
published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
12.12.2014 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
12.12.2014 |
Change - French title |
published on 14.01.2015 [2015/03] |
12.02.2014 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.09.2013 |
First examination report |
|
06.09.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.08.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
23.08.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] |
05.03.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 06.03.2013 [2013/10] |
28.11.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|