EP2665091 - Equipment for substrate surface treatment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2017 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | 23.10.2017 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kern Energy Enterprise Co., Ltd. 5F., No. 13, Ln. 42, Yixian Rd. Xinyi Dist. Taipei City 110 / TW | [2013/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hsiao, Ying-Shih Kern Energy Enterprise Co., Ltd. 5F., No.13, Ln.42, Yixian Rd., Xinyi Dist. Taipei City 110 / TW | [2013/47] | Representative(s) | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm Ingolstädter Straße 5 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/47] | Lang, Christian, et al LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei Rosenheimer Strasse 139 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12194303.9 | 26.11.2012 | [2013/47] | Priority number, date | TW20120117380 | 16.05.2012 Original published format: TW 101117380 | [2013/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2665091 | Date: | 20.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2665091 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/67, H01L21/677, H05B6/00 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
H01L21/67115 (EP,US);
H05B6/00 (US);
H01L21/6776 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2013/47] | H01L21/67 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/38] |
Former [2013/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Ausrüstung für Substratoberflächenbehandlung | [2013/47] | English: | Equipment for substrate surface treatment | [2013/47] | French: | Équipement de traitement de surface de substrat | [2013/47] | Examination procedure | 30.04.2013 | Examination requested [2013/47] | 10.08.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/47] | 04.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2016 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH1050646 (SHIMADA PHYSICAL CHEM IND CO) [Y] 7,8 * paragraph [0021]; figure 3 * [A] 1,9,12; | [XA]US6555835 (WYDEVEN THEODORE J [US]) [X] 1-6,9-13 * paragraphs [0031] , [0032]; figure 2 * [A] 7; | [YA]WO2012043272 (SEKISUI CHEMICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 7,8 * figure 2 *[A] 1,9,12 |