12.10.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
29.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.08.2018 [2018/31] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
01.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
09.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
26.06.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.07.2015 [2015/31] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
24.03.2015 |
Change - representative |
|
13.03.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
18.07.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
15.07.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
11.07.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
11.07.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
10.04.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.03.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
14.03.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.04.2014 [2014/16] |
15.11.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
15.11.2013 |
Change - designated states |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
12.11.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.06.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.06.2013 [2013/23] |