Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103130155B | Global Dossier | 21.12.2016 | B | CN103130155 | 05.06.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102011087301 | 29.11.2011 | DE102012215604 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2599742 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2014 | B1 | EP2599742 | 05.06.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011087301 | 29.11.2011 | DE102012215604 | 03.09.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102012215604 | 29.05.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102011087301 | 29.11.2011 | DE102012215604 | 03.09.2012 |