EP2600351 - Assembly and method for water injection of a neutron absorber element for cooling a nuclear reactor core in a crisis situation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AREVA NP Tour AREVA 1 place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/36] | For all designated states AREVA NP Tour AREVA 1 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [2013/23] | For all designated states Areva NP Tour Areva 1 Place Jean Millier 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Muller, Thierry Hameau de Sermesse 71390 St Helene / FR | 02 /
Guillaume, Emilie Maud 155-157 rue Lafayette 38200 Vienne / FR | 03 /
Bombail, Jean-Paul 23 rue Claudius Pionchon 69003 Lyon / FR | 04 /
Guillodo, Michael Villa des charmeaux 71190 Broye / FR | [2013/23] | Representative(s) | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12194606.5 | 28.11.2012 | [2013/23] | Priority number, date | FR20110060940 | 30.11.2011 Original published format: FR 1160940 | [2013/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2600351 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2600351 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G21C15/18, G21C9/033, // G21D3/04 | [2013/23] | CPC: |
G21C9/033 (EP,US);
G21C15/18 (KR);
G21C15/182 (EP,US);
G21D3/04 (EP,US);
Y02E30/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/23] | Title | German: | Anordnung und Verfahren zur Wassereinspritzung eines Neutronenabsorberelements zum Kühlen eines Reaktorkerns in einer Krisensituation | [2014/36] | English: | Assembly and method for water injection of a neutron absorber element for cooling a nuclear reactor core in a crisis situation | [2013/23] | French: | Ensemble et procédé d'injection d'eau d'un élément absorbeur de neutrons pour le refroidissement d'un coeur d'un réacteur nucléaire en situation de crise. | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/23] | Wassereinspritzkomplex und -verfahren eines neutronenabsorbierenden Elements für die Kühlung eines Atomreaktorkerns in einer Krisensituation | Examination procedure | 09.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 08.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.11.2012 | AL | 07.01.2015 | AT | 07.01.2015 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | FI | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | IT | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MK | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | NL | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | RS | 07.01.2015 | SE | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | SM | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | NO | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 28.11.2012 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MK | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PT | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 28.11.2012 | |
AT | 07.01.2015 | ||
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
SM | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
IT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RS | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 07.01.2015 | |
FI | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
SE | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
NO | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 07.01.2015 | |
NO | 07.04.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2010239062 (YEON JEI-WON [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0014] , [0033] - [0035] *; | [A]JP2011052970 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0042] - [0060] - [0066] *; | [A]GB892290 (FOSTER WHEELER LTD) [A] 1-10 * figure 1 * * page 1, lines 19-33,62-82 * * page 2, lines 32-60,89-112 * | [A] - Nuclear and Industrial Safety Agency, "Seismic Damage Information (29th Release)", (20110316), URL: http://www.nisa.meti.go.jp/english/files/en20110318-2.pdf, (20120725), XP055033863 [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 1 - page 5, line 10 * | [A] - TEPCO, "Press Release (March 13, 2011)", (20110313), URL: http://www.tepco.co.jp/en/press/corp-com/release/11031308-e.html, (20120726), XP002680813 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |