EP2586434 - N-hydroxylsulfonamide derivatives as new physiologically useful nitroxyl donors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been limited Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AT, CZ | published on 30.11.2022 [2022/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Johns Hopkins University 3400 North Charles Street Baltimore, MD 21218 / US | For all designated states Cardioxyl Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1450 Raleigh Rd., Suite 212 Chapel Hill, NC 27517 / US | [2016/06] |
Former [2015/43] | For all designated states Johns Hopkins University School of Medicine The Johns Hopkins University 100 North Charles Street, 5th Floor Baltimore, MD 21201 / US | ||
For all designated states Cardioxyl Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1450 Raleigh Rd., Suite 212 Chapel Hill, NC 27517 / US | |||
Former [2014/15] | For all designated states Johns Hopkins University School of Medicine The Johns Hopkins University 100 North Charles Street, 5th Floor Baltimore, MD 21201 / US | ||
For all designated states Cardioxyl Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 1450 Raleigh Rd,. Suite 212 Chapel Hill NC 27517 / US | |||
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states Johns Hopkins University School of Medicine The Johns Hopkins University 100 North Charles Street, 5th Floor Baltimore, MD 21201 / US | ||
For all designated states Cardioxyl Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 40 York Road, Suite 501 Towson, Maryland 21204 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Toscano, John P. 18 Tree Farm Court Glen Arm, Maryland 21057 / US | 02 /
Brookfield, Frederick Arthur 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB | 03 /
Cohen, Andrew D. 209 Prospect Ave. Mamaroneck, New York 10543 / US | 04 /
Courtney, Stephen Martin 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB | 05 /
Frost, Lisa Marie 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire OX14 4SA / GB | 06 /
Kalish, Vincent Jacob 344 Dubois Road Annapolis, Maryland 21401 / US | [2016/17] |
Former [2013/18] | 01 /
Toscano, John, P. 18 Tree Farm Court Glen Arm, Maryland 21057 / US | ||
02 /
Brookfield, Frederick, Arthur 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX14 4SA / GB | |||
03 /
Cohen, Andrew, D. 209 Prospect Ave. Mamaroneck, New York 10543 / US | |||
04 /
Courtney, Stephen, Martin 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX14 4SA / GB | |||
05 /
Frost, Lisa, Marie 114 Milton Park Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX14 4SA / GB | |||
06 /
Kalish, Vincent, Jacob 344 Dubois Road Annapolis, Maryland 21401 / US | Representative(s) | Wright, Simon Mark J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2013/18] | Application number, filing date | 12195118.0 | 16.03.2007 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | US20060783556P | 17.03.2006 Original published format: US 783556 P | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2586434 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2586434 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/17] | Type: | B3 Limited patent | No.: | EP2586434 | Date: | 06.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07C311/48, C07C317/14, C07C323/67, C07D213/74, C07D261/10, C07D263/58, C07D285/125, C07D295/096, C07D307/82, C07D309/12, C07D333/62, A61K31/18, A61P9/04 | [2015/35] | CPC: |
C07C311/48 (EP,KR,NO,RU,US);
A61K31/18 (KR,NO,RU);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/10 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP,NO);
A61P9/06 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C317/14 (EP,NO,RU,US);
C07C323/67 (EP,NO,RU,US);
C07D207/36 (RU);
C07D213/74 (EP,NO,US);
C07D231/18 (EP,NO,US);
C07D233/84 (RU);
C07D261/10 (EP,NO,US);
C07D263/58 (EP,NO,US);
C07D285/125 (EP,NO,US);
C07D295/096 (EP,NO,US);
C07D307/02 (RU);
C07D307/82 (EP,KR,NO,US);
C07D309/12 (EP,KR,NO,US);
C07D317/14 (EP,KR,NO,US);
C07D333/18 (RU);
|
Former IPC [2013/18] | A61K31/18, A61P9/04, C07D213/74, C07D261/10, C07D263/58, C07D285/125, C07D307/82, C07D333/62 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/17] |
Former [2013/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | N-hydroxylsulfonamidderivate als neue physiologisch nützliche Nytroxyl-Spender | [2013/18] | English: | N-hydroxylsulfonamide derivatives as new physiologically useful nitroxyl donors | [2013/18] | French: | Dérivés de N-hydroxylsulfonamide en tant que nouveaux donneurs de nitroxyle physiologiquement utiles | [2013/18] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.11.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 17.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07753345.3 / EP1998761 | EP12155608.8 / EP2489350 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Limitations: | 16.12.2020 | Date of receipt of request for limitation | admissible | 19.11.2021 | Communication of intention to limit the patent | 25.02.2022 | Fee for printing patent specification after limitation | 09.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | [2022/48] |
Former [2022/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | SU186456 [ ] (LENINGRAD CHEMICAL-PHARMACEUTICAL INSTITUTE); | [X]US3751255 (OLIVARES I, et al) [X] 12* compounds 5, 6, 9, 11 *; | [X]US6525081 (MATSUMOTO SAICHI [JP], et al) [X] 12 * compound 3g; column 14, lines 38-48 *; | [AD]US2004038947 (WINK DAVID A [US], et al) [AD] 1-13 * paragraph [0050]; claim 1 *; | [X]US2005153966 (GANGLOFF ANTHONY R [US], et al) [X] 12 * paragraph [0760]; claims 1, 101, 102 *; | [AD]US6936639 (WINK DAVID A [US], et al) [AD] 1-13 * column 4, lines 29-41; claims 1, 8, 12, 13 *; | [XD] - A. SCOZZAFAVA, ET AL., "Carbonic anhydrase and matrix metalloproteinase inhibitors: sulphonylated amino acid hydroxamates with MMP inhibitory properties act as efficient inhibitors of CA isozymes I, II, and IV, and N-hydroxysulfonamides inhibit both of these zinc enzymes", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20000913), vol. 43, no. 20, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 3677 - 3687, XP002394373 [XD] 12 * table 2; compounds 46-48 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm000027t | [ ] - A. SCOZZAFAVA, ET AL., "Carbonic anhydrase and matrix metalloproteinase inhibitors: sulphonylated amino acid hydroxamates with MMP inhibitory properties act as efficient inhibitors of CA isozymes I, II, and IV, and N-hydroxysulfonamides inhibit both of these zinc enzymes", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20010308), vol. 44, no. 6, page 1016, XP002445147 [ ] * compounds 78, 79 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm0004852 | [X] - S. BRYNES, ET AL., "Potential inhibitors of L-asparagine biosynthesis. 4. Substituted sulphonamide and sulphonylhydrazide analogues of L-asparagine", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (197801), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 45 - 49, XP002445047 [X] 12 * compound 3a (X = H or CH2Ph);; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00199a008 | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1994:645157, XP002445149 [X] 12 * abstract * | [ ] - F. ZANI, ET AL., "Anticrobial and genotoxic properties of quinoline derivatives", BOLLETTINO CHIMICO FARMACEUTICO, SOCIETA EDITORIALE FARMACEUTICA, MILANO, IT, (1994), vol. 133, no. 5, pages 328 - 338 | [X] - T. SUZUKI, ET AL, "Novel inhibitors of human histone deacetylases: design, synthesis, enzyme inhibition and cancer cell growth inhibition of SAHA-based non-hydroxamates", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20050125), vol. 48, no. 4, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 1019 - 1032, XP002376722 [X] 12 * scheme 2, product of compound 60 with reagent c; page 1027, column L, line 73 - column R, line 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm049207j | [X] - CAPLUS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1967:85468, XP002445052 [X] 12 * abstract * | [X] - S BRYNES, ET AL., "Potential antitumour agents via inhibitors of L-asparagine synthetase: substituted sulphonamides and sulphonyl hydrazides related to glutamine", JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, AMERICAN PHARMACEUTICAL ASSOCIATION, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (197811), vol. 67, no. 11, pages 1550 - 1553, XP002445048 [X] 12 * compound VIa;; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jps.2600671115 | by applicant | - MINCIONE, F.;; MENABUONI, L.;; BRIGANTI, F.;; MINCIONE, G.;; SCOZZAFAVA, A.;; SUPURAN, C.T. J., ENZYME INHIBITION, (1998), vol. 13, pages 267 - 284 | - SCOZZAFAVA, A.;; SUPURAN, C.T., J. MED. CHEM., (2000), vol. 43, pages 3677 - 3687 |