EP2607740 - Anti-vibration device and assembly including such device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.11.2016 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.11.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.2016 [2016/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HUTCHINSON 2, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coudiere, Franck 7 Villechaumont 45190 CRAVANT / FR | 02 /
Desmoulins, Mickaël 5 rue des Caves 45310 VILLAMBLAIN / FR | 03 /
Pellegrino, Allan 38 rue des Empereurs 28200 CHATEAUDUN / FR | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12195175.0 | 30.11.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | US201113334939 | 22.12.2011 Original published format: US201113334939 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2607740 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Classification | IPC: | F16F1/38 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
F16F1/3849 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vibrationsschutzvorrichtung und Anordnung mit einer derartigen Vorrichtung | [2013/26] | English: | Anti-vibration device and assembly including such device | [2013/26] | French: | Dispositif anti-vibration et ensemble comprenant un tel dispositif | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/52] | 05.07.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2015 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | US2010264570 |