EP2631217 - Method for cyclically preparing boron and coproducing sodium cryolite using sodium fluoborate as intermediate material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shenzhen Sunxing Light Alloys Materials Co., Ltd Building A, Sunxing Plant Hi-Tech Industrial District Gongming Town Guanguang Road, Baoan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518000 / CN | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Xuemin Buiding A, Sunxing Plant Hi-Tech Industrial District Gongming Town Guanguang Road, Baoan District 518000 Shenzhen / CN | 02 /
Yu, Yueming Buiding A, Sunxing Plant Hi-Tech Industrial District Gongming Town Guanguang Road, Baoan District 518000 Shenzhen / CN | 03 /
Ye, Qingdong Buiding A, Sunxing Plant Hi-Tech Industrial District Gongming Town Guanguang Road, Baoan District 518000 Shenzhen / CN | 04 /
Yang, Jun Buiding A, Sunxing Plant Hi-Tech Industrial District Gongming Town Guanguang Road, Baoan District 518000 Shenzhen / CN | 05 /
Zhou, Zhi Buiding A, Sunxing Plant Hi-Tech Industrial District Gongming Town Guanguang Road, Baoan District 518000 Shenzhen / CN | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Proi World Intellectual Property GmbH Obermattweg 12 6052 Hergiswil, Kanton Nidwalden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | ProI European Patent Attorneys Postfach 2123 90711 Fürth / DE | Application number, filing date | 12195388.9 | 04.12.2012 | [2013/35] | Priority number, date | CN20121043677 | 24.02.2012 Original published format: CN201210043677 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2631217 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2631217 | Date: | 25.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C01B35/02, C01B35/06, C01F7/54, C01F7/76, B82Y30/00, B82Y40/00, C01B32/50, C25C3/18 | [2017/16] | CPC: |
C01B35/023 (EP,GB,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
B82Y40/00 (EP,US);
C01B32/50 (EP,US);
C01B35/06 (EP,US);
C01F7/54 (EP,GB,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/35] | C01B35/06, C01B35/02, C01B31/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur zyklischen Herstellung von Bor und gleichzeitige Herstellung von Natriumkryolith mit Natriumfluoroborat als Zwischenprodukt | [2017/17] | English: | Method for cyclically preparing boron and coproducing sodium cryolite using sodium fluoborate as intermediate material | [2013/35] | French: | Procédé permettant de préparer cycliquement du bore et de coproduire du cryolite de sodium à l'aide de fluoroborate de sodium comme matériau intermédiaire | [2017/17] |
Former [2013/35] | Verfahren zur zyklischen Herstellung von Bor und gleichzeitige Herstellung von Natriumkryolith mit Natriumfluoborat als Zwischenprodukt | ||
Former [2013/35] | Procédé permettant de préparer cycliquement du bore et de coproduire du cryolite de sodium à l'aide de fluotitanate de sodium comme matériau intermédiaire | Examination procedure | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 26.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.12.2012 | AL | 25.10.2017 | AT | 25.10.2017 | CY | 25.10.2017 | CZ | 25.10.2017 | DK | 25.10.2017 | EE | 25.10.2017 | FI | 25.10.2017 | HR | 25.10.2017 | IT | 25.10.2017 | LT | 25.10.2017 | LV | 25.10.2017 | MC | 25.10.2017 | MK | 25.10.2017 | PL | 25.10.2017 | PT | 25.10.2017 | RO | 25.10.2017 | RS | 25.10.2017 | SE | 25.10.2017 | SI | 25.10.2017 | SK | 25.10.2017 | SM | 25.10.2017 | TR | 25.10.2017 | IE | 04.12.2017 | LU | 04.12.2017 | MT | 04.12.2017 | BE | 31.12.2017 | CH | 31.12.2017 | LI | 31.12.2017 | FR | 02.01.2018 | BG | 25.01.2018 | GB | 25.01.2018 | NO | 25.01.2018 | GR | 26.01.2018 | IS | 25.02.2018 | DE | 03.07.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 04.12.2012 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
PT | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | HU | 04.12.2012 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
TR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.12.2012 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
MK | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.12.2012 | |
AT | 25.10.2017 | ||
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
MC | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SI | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
CH | 31.12.2017 | ||
LI | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
GB | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BE | 31.12.2017 | ||
FR | 02.01.2018 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
DE | 03.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
IE | 04.12.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
LU | 04.12.2017 | ||
MT | 04.12.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RO | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
IT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
PL | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
SM | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
CY | 25.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 25.10.2017 | ||
DK | 25.10.2017 | ||
EE | 25.10.2017 | ||
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
SK | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 25.10.2017 | |
FI | 25.10.2017 | ||
HR | 25.10.2017 | ||
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
LV | 25.10.2017 | ||
RS | 25.10.2017 | ||
SE | 25.10.2017 | ||
BG | 25.01.2018 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | ||
GR | 26.01.2018 | ||
IS | 25.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 25.10.2017 | |
LT | 25.10.2017 | ||
NO | 25.01.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2810683 (ELLIS RICHARD B); | [A]WO03051773 (GROUPE MINUTIA INC [CA], et al); |