EP2605182 - High-security biometric authentication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Takao c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Kenta c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 12th Floor, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | [2013/25] | Representative(s) | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/25] | Moore, Graeme Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | Application number, filing date | 12195628.8 | 05.12.2012 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | JP20110270823 | 12.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011270823 | [2013/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2605182 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2605182 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/62 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
G06V40/40 (EP,US);
H04L63/0861 (US);
G06V40/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Hochsicheres biometrisches Authentifizierungssystem | [2013/25] | English: | High-security biometric authentication system | [2013/25] | French: | Système d'authentification biométrique haute sécurité | [2013/25] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/25] | 07.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 18.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/47] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2113867 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-7 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0057] * * page 26; figure 3 *; | [Y] - FRÉDÉRIC BIMBOT ET AL, "A Tutorial on Text-Independent Speaker Verification", EURASIP JOURNAL ON ADVANCES IN SIGNAL PROCESSING, (20040101), vol. 2004, no. 4, doi:10.1155/S1110865704310024, ISSN 1687-6172, pages 430 - 451, XP055007011 [Y] 1,2 * Hnorm,Tnorm; page 439 * * page 440, column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1155/S1110865704310024 | [Y] - Ted Dunstone ET AL, "Hypothesis verification, data quality check and Biometric menagerie", Biometric System and Data Analysis, US, New York, Springer, (20090219), ISBN 978-0-38-777627-9, XP055141686 [Y] 3-7 * point 8.1.2; page 157, paragraph 2 - page 158, paragraph 1 * * 8.1.3; page 158, paragraph 1 * * page 189, paragraph 4 * | [A] - Anil K Jain, "Likelihood ratio test", Encyclopedia of Biometrics, US, New York, Springer, (20090101), pages 899 - 899, ISBN 978-0-38-773002-8, XP055141344 [A] 3-7 * Likelihood Ratio Test; page 899 * | [T] - "Kullback-Leibler diverge", Wikipedia, (20140918), URL: http://en.wikipedia.org/wiki/Kullback%E2%80%93Leibler_divergence, (20140918), XP055141333 [T] * abstract * | by applicant | - Q. WANG; S. KULKARNI; S. VERDU, "Divergence estimation for multidimensional densities via k-nearest-neighbor distances", IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON INFORMATION THEORY (ISIT2009, (2009), vol. 55, XP011256135 | - K. TAKAHASHI; M. MIMURA; Y ISOBE; Y SETO, "A Secure and User-Friendly Multi-Modal Biometric System", PROC. SPIE, (2004), vol. 5404, pages 12 - 19, XP001509147 |