EP2602211 - Device for supporting a motor vehicle part enabling said part to tilt [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Faurecia Bloc Avant 2, rue Hennape 92000 Nanterre / FR | [2013/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Combescot, Olivier 2 ruelles de l'embarcadère 90850 ESSERT / FR | [2013/24] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/24] | Domenego, Bertrand Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12195966.2 | 06.12.2012 | [2013/24] | Priority number, date | FR20110061225 | 06.12.2011 Original published format: FR 1161225 | [2013/24] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2602211 | Date: | 12.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2602211 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/68, B62D65/16 | [2013/24] | CPC: |
B65D85/68 (EP);
B65D2585/6882 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/42] |
Former [2013/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Haltevorrichtung für ein Kraftfahrzeugteil, die das Kippen dieses Teils ermöglicht | [2013/24] | English: | Device for supporting a motor vehicle part enabling said part to tilt | [2013/24] | French: | Dispositif de support d'une pièce de véhicule automobile permettant un basculement de ladite pièce | [2013/24] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2013 | Examination requested [2013/50] | 06.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.12.2012 | AL | 14.10.2015 | AT | 14.10.2015 | BG | 14.10.2015 | CY | 14.10.2015 | CZ | 14.10.2015 | DK | 14.10.2015 | EE | 14.10.2015 | FI | 14.10.2015 | HR | 14.10.2015 | IT | 14.10.2015 | LT | 14.10.2015 | LV | 14.10.2015 | MC | 14.10.2015 | MK | 14.10.2015 | MT | 14.10.2015 | NL | 14.10.2015 | PL | 14.10.2015 | RO | 14.10.2015 | RS | 14.10.2015 | SE | 14.10.2015 | SI | 14.10.2015 | SK | 14.10.2015 | SM | 14.10.2015 | TR | 14.10.2015 | IE | 06.12.2015 | LU | 06.12.2015 | BE | 31.12.2015 | CH | 31.12.2015 | LI | 31.12.2015 | NO | 14.01.2016 | GR | 15.01.2016 | IS | 14.02.2016 | PT | 15.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MK | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
TR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 06.12.2012 | |
AT | 14.10.2015 | ||
BG | 14.10.2015 | ||
CY | 14.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
MT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SI | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
CH | 31.12.2015 | ||
LI | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
IE | 06.12.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
DK | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
SM | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
EE | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RO | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
SK | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
CZ | 14.10.2015 | ||
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
LU | 06.12.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
MC | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LV | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 14.10.2015 | |
FI | 14.10.2015 | ||
HR | 14.10.2015 | ||
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
PL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
BE | 31.12.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
GR | 15.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
PT | 15.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 14.10.2015 | |
IT | 14.10.2015 | ||
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
RS | 14.10.2015 | ||
SE | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | IT | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NL | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
IS | 14.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | IT | 14.10.2015 | |
LT | 14.10.2015 | ||
NO | 14.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 14.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2928904 (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE [FR]) [X] 1,7,8,10 * page 5, line 6 - line 16; figures 4a, 7, 8 *; | [A]DE3903964 (FREIMUTH GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1 * |