EP2609889 - Collection tray [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2015 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Winkelmann, Wolfgang Horemer 4 72076 Tübingen / DE | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Winkelmann, Wolfgang Horemer 4 72076 Tübingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Wohlfahrt, Jan Günther, et al Gleiss Große Schrell und Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Leitzstraße 45 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/32] |
Former [2013/27] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 12196070.2 | 07.12.2012 | [2013/27] | Priority number, date | DE20112052539U | 29.12.2011 Original published format: DE 202011052539 U | [2013/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2609889 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2609889 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B19/02, A61B19/08 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
A61B46/20 (EP);
A61B46/00 (EP);
A61B2046/201 (EP);
A61B46/23 (EP);
A61J19/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | Auffangschale | [2013/27] | English: | Collection tray | [2013/27] | French: | Plateau de collecteur | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 04.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/03] | 10.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 18.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2012 | AL | 17.09.2014 | BG | 17.09.2014 | CY | 17.09.2014 | CZ | 17.09.2014 | DK | 17.09.2014 | EE | 17.09.2014 | ES | 17.09.2014 | FI | 17.09.2014 | HR | 17.09.2014 | IT | 17.09.2014 | LT | 17.09.2014 | LV | 17.09.2014 | MC | 17.09.2014 | MK | 17.09.2014 | MT | 17.09.2014 | PL | 17.09.2014 | RO | 17.09.2014 | RS | 17.09.2014 | SE | 17.09.2014 | SI | 17.09.2014 | SK | 17.09.2014 | SM | 17.09.2014 | TR | 17.09.2014 | IE | 07.12.2014 | LU | 07.12.2014 | NO | 17.12.2014 | GR | 18.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | IS | 17.01.2015 | PT | 19.01.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MK | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
SM | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
MT | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
TR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
BG | 17.09.2014 | ||
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | BG | 17.09.2014 | |
CY | 17.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/27] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
MC | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SI | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
IT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
DK | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
PL | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
CZ | 17.09.2014 | ||
EE | 17.09.2014 | ||
ES | 17.09.2014 | ||
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
SK | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
IS | 17.01.2015 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
RO | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
PT | 19.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
HR | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
LV | 17.09.2014 | ||
RS | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 17.09.2014 | |
FI | 17.09.2014 | ||
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
GR | 18.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
NO | 17.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 17.09.2014 | |
LT | 17.09.2014 | ||
SE | 17.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 17.09.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010174415 (HUMAYUN MARK [US], et al) [X] 1,12-14 * paragraphs [0051] - [0061]; figures 1-2 * * paragraph [0065] * * figure 8 * [Y] 2-8,15 [I] 9-11; | [Y]DE202006004494U (REISS ULRICH [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraphs [0008] - [0013]; figures 1-2 *; | [Y]US5220699 (FARRIS R DAVID [US]) [Y] 15 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 36 * | [Y] - "Hair Wash / Rinse Tray", (20090608), URL: http://www.ezcaremedical.com/store/index.php?main_page=product_info&cPath=546_100_136&products_id=516, (20130311), XP055055955 [Y] 3-7 * the whole document * | [YA] - "Hair washing tray comfort cape", (20100927), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20100927233211/http://www.completecareshop.co.uk/disability-elderly-aid/1110/hair_washing_tray_comfort_cape.html, (20130311), XP055055957 [Y] 8 * the whole document * [A] 3-7 |