EP2607510 - Nickel-cobalt-based alloy and bond coat and bond coated articles incorporating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 15.03.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2019 | Revocation of patent | published on 17.04.2019 [2019/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onal, Kivilcim 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 02 /
Hardwicke, Canan Uslu 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | 03 /
Schaeffer, Jon Conrad 300 Garlington Road Greenville, SC South Carolina 29615 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Szary, Anne Catherine GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/26] | Szary, Anne Catherine GE International Inc. Global Patent Operation - Europe 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12196187.4 | 07.12.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | US201113330090 | 19.12.2011 Original published format: US201113330090 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607510 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2607510 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C22C19/05, C23C4/08 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
C22C19/058 (EP,US);
C23C28/3215 (EP,US);
C23C28/3455 (EP,US);
F01D5/288 (EP,US);
F05D2300/17 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12736 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | Nickelkobaltbasierte Legierung und Haftbeschichtung sowie haftbeschichtete Artikel damit | [2013/26] | English: | Nickel-cobalt-based alloy and bond coat and bond coated articles incorporating the same | [2013/26] | French: | Alliage en nickel-cobalt et revêtement de liaison et articles revêtus de liaison incorporant celui-ci | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 06.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.03.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.05.2015
01.06.2015
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Kaiser, Axel CT IP S DE Corporate Intellectual Property Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 80200 München / DE | [2017/50] |
Former [2015/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.05.2015
Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE Opponent's representative Kaiser, Axel CT IP S DE Corporate Intellectual Property Otto-Hahn-Ring 6 80200 München / DE | 15.07.2015 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 22.01.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 21.11.2017 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 21.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.12.2017 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.12.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 28.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.12.2018 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2012 | AL | 27.08.2014 | AT | 27.08.2014 | BE | 27.08.2014 | CY | 27.08.2014 | CZ | 27.08.2014 | DK | 27.08.2014 | EE | 27.08.2014 | ES | 27.08.2014 | FI | 27.08.2014 | HR | 27.08.2014 | IT | 27.08.2014 | LT | 27.08.2014 | LV | 27.08.2014 | MC | 27.08.2014 | MK | 27.08.2014 | MT | 27.08.2014 | NL | 27.08.2014 | PL | 27.08.2014 | RO | 27.08.2014 | RS | 27.08.2014 | SE | 27.08.2014 | SI | 27.08.2014 | SK | 27.08.2014 | SM | 27.08.2014 | TR | 27.08.2014 | BG | 27.11.2014 | NO | 27.11.2014 | GR | 28.11.2014 | IE | 07.12.2014 | LU | 07.12.2014 | IS | 27.12.2014 | PT | 29.12.2014 | GB | 07.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | DE | 01.07.2017 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MK | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
GB | 07.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
DE | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
GB | 07.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
DE | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
DE | 01.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
SM | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
MT | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
TR | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.12.2012 | |
AT | 27.08.2014 | ||
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IE | 07.12.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
LU | 07.12.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
HR | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
RS | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
NO | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 27.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1319730 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,8,16 * paragraph [0015]; claim 1 * |