EP2741067 - Testing system and method for testing the seal of a glove which is installed in the port of an insulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/24] | Test disc, testing system and method for testing the seal of a glove which is installed in the port of an insulator, a glove and an insulator for use with the testing system | ||
[2016/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.2018 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Keil, Michael Breslauerstr. 5 35325 Mücke-Merlau / DE | [2017/13] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Keil, Michael Breslauerstr. 5 35325 Mücke-Merlau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keil, Michael Stückweg 10 35325 Mücke-Merlau / DE | 02 /
Keil, Christopher, Dr. Stückweg 10 35325 Mücke-Merlau / DE | [2014/24] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Neue Mainzer Straße 75 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/13] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft mbB Bettinastraße 53-55 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2014/24] | Patentanwälte Olbricht Buchhold Keulertz Partnerschaft Bettinastrasse 53-55 60325 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 12196195.7 | 07.12.2012 | [2014/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2741067 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2741067 | Date: | 29.03.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/02, G01M3/32, G21F7/053, B25J21/02 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
G01M3/3218 (EP,US);
B25J21/02 (EP,US);
G01M3/027 (EP,US);
G21F7/053 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/24] | G01M3/02, G01M3/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/13] |
Former [2014/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Prüfsystem und Verfahren zur Prüfung der Dichtigkeit eines Handschuhs, der in einem Port eines Isolators installiert ist | [2016/46] | English: | Testing system and method for testing the seal of a glove which is installed in the port of an insulator | [2016/46] | French: | Système de contrôle et procédé de vérification de l'étanchéité d'un gant installé dans un port d'un isolant | [2016/46] |
Former [2014/24] | Prüfscheibe, Prüfsystem und Verfahren zur Prüfung der Dichtigkeit eines Handschuhs, der in einem Port eines Isolators installiert ist, ein Handschuh sowie ein Isolator zur Verwendung mit dem Prüfsystem | ||
Former [2014/24] | Test disc, testing system and method for testing the seal of a glove which is installed in the port of an insulator, a glove and an insulator for use with the testing system | ||
Former [2014/24] | Disque de vérification, système de contrôle et procédé de vérification de l'étanchéité d'un gant installé dans un port d'un isolant, gant ainsi qu'isolant destiné à l'utilisation avec le système de contrôle | Examination procedure | 02.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 12.01.2015 | Observations by third parties | 18.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.03.2017 | CY | 29.03.2017 | DK | 29.03.2017 | EE | 29.03.2017 | FI | 29.03.2017 | HR | 29.03.2017 | LT | 29.03.2017 | LV | 29.03.2017 | MC | 29.03.2017 | MK | 29.03.2017 | MT | 29.03.2017 | PL | 29.03.2017 | RO | 29.03.2017 | RS | 29.03.2017 | SE | 29.03.2017 | SI | 29.03.2017 | SK | 29.03.2017 | SM | 29.03.2017 | TR | 29.03.2017 | BG | 29.06.2017 | NO | 29.06.2017 | GR | 30.06.2017 | IS | 29.07.2017 | PT | 31.07.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | CY | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
TR | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | CY | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MK | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | CY | 29.03.2017 | |
DK | 29.03.2017 | ||
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | DK | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MC | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
MT | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | DK | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SI | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 29.03.2017 | |
EE | 29.03.2017 | ||
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | EE | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
SM | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
PT | 31.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | EE | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
PL | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | EE | 29.03.2017 | |
FI | 29.03.2017 | ||
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
RO | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
SK | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | ||
IS | 29.07.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | FI | 29.03.2017 | |
HR | 29.03.2017 | ||
LT | 29.03.2017 | ||
LV | 29.03.2017 | ||
RS | 29.03.2017 | ||
SE | 29.03.2017 | ||
BG | 29.06.2017 | ||
NO | 29.06.2017 | ||
GR | 30.06.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE102010031204 (JUNG GUMMITECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 12 * paragraphs [0040] , [0041] , [0042] , [0045] * * figure 1 *; | [AD]US6810715 (CASTRO JULIO M [US], et al) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE10145597 (KEIL MICHAEL [DE]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE102004030766 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [AD] 1-18 * the whole document * | Examination | - SKAN AG, "WirelessGT - The innovative glove leak testing system", XP055175441 | by applicant | DE102004030766 | US6810715 | DE10145597 | DE20115261U |