EP2659947 - Method and apparatus for removing contaminants from exhaust gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 20.07.2018 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | [2013/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suchak, Naresh J. ".." deceased / US | [2018/03] |
Former [2013/45] | 01 /
Suchak, Naresh J. 245 Demarest Street Glen Rock, NJ New Jersey 07452 / US | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Andreas, et al RGTH Patentanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 33 02 11 80062 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Hofmann, Andreas, et al Richter Werdermann Gerbaulet Hofmann Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 11 80062 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 12196205.4 | 09.12.2012 | [2013/45] | Priority number, date | US201261640128P | 30.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261640128 P | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2659947 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/56, B01D53/78 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
B01D53/56 (EP);
B01D53/78 (EP);
B01D2251/104 (EP);
B01D2252/1035 (EP);
B01D2257/2045 (EP);
B01D2257/302 (EP);
B01D2257/404 (EP);
B01D2257/602 (EP);
B01D2258/01 (EP);
B01D2258/025 (EP);
B01D2259/4566 (EP);
B01D53/002 (EP);
B01D53/323 (EP);
B01D53/40 (EP);
B01D53/50 (EP);
B01D53/60 (EP);
B01D53/64 (EP);
B01D53/68 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Entfernen von Verunreinigungen aus Abgasen | [2013/45] | English: | Method and apparatus for removing contaminants from exhaust gases | [2013/45] | French: | Procédé et appareil d'élimination de contaminants de gaz d'échappement | [2013/45] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/25] | 11.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/34] | 03.04.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.04.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]CN101822937 (UNIV WUHAN SCIENCE & ENG) [X] 1-10,13-15 * paragraphs [0018] - [0021]; figure 1 * [Y] 11,12; | [XY]WO2005014134 (BELCO TECHN CORP [US]) [X] 1-10,13-15 * the whole document * [Y] 11,12; | [XD]US5206002 (SKELLEY ARTHUR P [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4-9,13-15 * column 5, line 30 - column 7, line 56; figure 1 *; | [XD]US7303735 (SUCHAK NARESH J [US], et al) [XD] 1,2,4-9,13-15 * column 6, line 34 - column 10, line 60; figures 1-3 *; | [XD]US7766995 (SUCHAK NARESH J [US], et al) [XD] 1-9,14,15 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 36; figure 1 *; | [Y]GB1229107 (MOSKOVSKY GOSUDARSTVENNY UNIVERSITET) [Y] 11,12 * claims 1, 4 *; | [Y]JP2008073642 (NAT INST OF ADV IND & TECHNOL) [Y] 11,12 * paragraphs [0028] , [0029] , [0037] *; | [Y]US2007128090 (RAY ISAAC [US], et al) [Y] 3 * paragraphs [0031] , [0049]; figure 1 *; | [Y]JPH1190151 (INA RESERCH KK) [Y] 3 * paragraph [0015]; figure 2 * | by applicant | US5206002 | US6162409 | US7303735 | US6649132 | US7766995 |