Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9232024 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2016 | B2 | US2013227139 | 29.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261605097 | 29.02.2012 | US201213709363 | 10.12.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2805529 | Global Dossier | 06.06.2017 | C | CA2805529 | 29.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261605097 | 29.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2634956 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2016 | B1 | EP2634956 | 20.08.2014 | A3 | EP2634956 | 04.09.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261605097 | 29.02.2012 |