EP2586991 - Turbine engine guide vane and arrays thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/18] | Turbine Engine Guide Vane and Arrays Thereof | ||
[2015/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.12.2016 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.2017 [2017/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation 10 Farm Springs Road Farmington, CT 06032 / US | [2016/43] |
Former [2013/18] | For all designated states United Technologies Corporation One Financial Plaza Hartford, CT 06101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aggarwala, Andrew S. 54 Evans Avenue East Hartford, CT Connecticut 06118 / US | 02 /
Gacek, Richard E. 23 Kent Lane South Windsor, CT Connecticut 06074 / US | 03 /
Wagner, Joel H. 203 Clearfield Road Wethersfield, CT Connecticut 06109 / US | 04 /
Noall, Jeff S. 86 Oak Street South Windsor, CT Connecticut 06074 / US | [2013/18] | Representative(s) | Hull, James Edward Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2013/18] | Application number, filing date | 12196352.4 | 21.10.2005 | [2013/18] | Priority number, date | US20040019870 | 21.12.2004 Original published format: US 19870 | [2013/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2586991 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2586991 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2586991 | Date: | 03.02.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01D9/04, F01D5/14, F01D9/06 | [2013/18] | CPC: |
F01D5/145 (EP,US);
F01D5/141 (EP,US);
F01D9/041 (EP,US);
F01D9/065 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2016/05] |
Former [2013/18] | DE, GB | Title | German: | Turbinenmotorleitschaufel und Anordnung davon | [2013/18] | English: | Turbine engine guide vane and arrays thereof | [2015/41] | French: | Aubes directrices de moteur de turbine et réseaux d'aubes directrices | [2013/18] |
Former [2013/18] | Turbine Engine Guide Vane and Arrays Thereof | Examination procedure | 10.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 08.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.11.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.11.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.11.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05256519.9 / EP1674664 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003129056 (KUNO NAOKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] , [0031] * * figure 2 * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]EP1333181 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND [JP]) [Y] 4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0030] , [0035] * * figure - *; | [Y]US3426965 (KULLING GERALD J) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * column 2, line 44 - line 57 * * column 3, line 6 - line 12 * * figure 4 * |