EP2570647 - A fuel injection system for a saddle ride type four-wheel vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.01.2015 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2013/12] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGUCHI, Masataka KK Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 02 /
URANO, Naoki KK Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 03 /
ITO, Atsushi KK Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 04 /
HOTTA, Kazuhito KK Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | 05 /
TSURUTA, Yuichiro KK Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho 4-1 Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama / JP | [2013/12] | Representative(s) | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95, Rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/13] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95, rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | ||
Former [2013/12] | Ilgart, Jean-Christophe BREVALEX 95 rue d'Amsterdam 75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR | Application number, filing date | 12196507.3 | 07.02.2005 | [2013/12] | Priority number, date | JP20040030833 | 06.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004030833 | JP20040056653 | 01.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004056653 | JP20040062421 | 05.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004062421 | [2013/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2570647 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2570647 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F02M37/00, F02M37/10, B60K15/03, B62J35/00, B62J37/00, F01N3/34, B62K5/01 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
F02D33/003 (EP,US);
B62J35/00 (EP,US);
B62J37/00 (EP,US);
B62K5/01 (EP,US);
F01N3/34 (EP,US);
F02M37/007 (EP,US);
F02M37/0076 (EP,US);
F02M37/103 (EP,US);
F02M37/44 (EP,US);
F02M37/46 (EP,US);
F02M39/005 (EP,US);
F02M39/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, PT [2013/12] | Title | German: | Kraftstoffeinspritzsystem für ein vierrädriges Sattelfahrzeug | [2013/12] | English: | A fuel injection system for a saddle ride type four-wheel vehicle | [2013/12] | French: | Système d'injection de carburant pour un véhicule à quatre roues de type à selle | [2013/12] | Examination procedure | 17.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 30.10.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05100834.0 / EP1561941 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050100834) is 06.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | PT | 28.07.2014 | [2015/02] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2975713 (WRIGHT GEORGE W) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [A]JPS6037432U (-) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]JPS61155613 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]JPS626126U (-) [A] 1* figure - *; | [X]EP0612919 (TECHNOFLOW TUBE SYSTEMS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [A]CA2481198 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, line 15 - page 9, line 17 *; | [A]EP0903489 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 16 - page 4, paragraph 44 *; | [AD]JPH1193794 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]JPH11198882 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]JP2000204939 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US6250076 (KAWAMATA NORIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 5 - column 7, line 52 *; | [A]US2001027890 (BRIA JOSEPH JAMES [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * * page 7, paragraph 123 - page 8, paragraph 142 *; | [X]JP2002293281 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraph [0015] *; | [A]JP2003120455 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract *; | [X]US6588449 (KIPPE BRADLEY N [US]) [X] 1-4 * abstract *; | [AD]JP2003214274 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH01193794 | JPH11198882 | JP2000204939 | JP2003214274 |