EP2607526 - Method of manufacturing a silicon single crystal substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/26] | Silicon single crystal substrate and method of manufacturing the same | ||
[2013/50] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siltronic AG Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2013/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakai, Katsuhiko 2-3-34 Shinkai, Murozumi Hikari, Yamaguchi 743-0071 / JP | 02 /
Ookubo, Masamichi 7-1-14 Mitsui Hikari, Yamaguchi 743-0011 / JP | 03 /
Sakamoto, Hikaru Wadacho 14-16-201 Hikari, Yamaguchi 743-0044 / JP | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Staudacher, Wolfgang, et al Siltronic AG Corporate Intellectual Property Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4 81737 München / DE | [2013/26] | Application number, filing date | 12196921.6 | 13.12.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | JP20110279956 | 21.12.2011 Original published format: JP 2011279956 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2607526 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2607526 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C30B15/04, C30B29/06, C30B33/02, C30B15/20 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
C30B29/06 (EP,US);
H01L21/822 (KR);
C30B15/04 (EP,US);
C30B15/206 (EP,US);
C30B33/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Siliciumeinzelkristallsubstrats | [2013/50] | English: | Method of manufacturing a silicon single crystal substrate | [2013/50] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un substrat de monocristal de silicium | [2013/50] |
Former [2013/26] | Siliciumeinzelkristallsubstrat und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | ||
Former [2013/26] | Silicon single crystal substrate and method of manufacturing the same | ||
Former [2013/26] | Substrat de monocristal de silicium et son procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 13.12.2012 | Examination requested [2013/26] | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2012 | AL | 23.04.2014 | AT | 23.04.2014 | BE | 23.04.2014 | CY | 23.04.2014 | CZ | 23.04.2014 | DK | 23.04.2014 | EE | 23.04.2014 | ES | 23.04.2014 | FI | 23.04.2014 | HR | 23.04.2014 | IT | 23.04.2014 | LT | 23.04.2014 | LV | 23.04.2014 | MC | 23.04.2014 | MK | 23.04.2014 | MT | 23.04.2014 | NL | 23.04.2014 | PL | 23.04.2014 | RO | 23.04.2014 | RS | 23.04.2014 | SE | 23.04.2014 | SI | 23.04.2014 | SK | 23.04.2014 | SM | 23.04.2014 | TR | 23.04.2014 | BG | 23.07.2014 | NO | 23.07.2014 | GR | 24.07.2014 | IS | 23.08.2014 | PT | 25.08.2014 | IE | 13.12.2014 | LU | 13.12.2014 | FR | 31.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MK | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
TR | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
SM | 23.04.2014 | ||
TR | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
MT | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
TR | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.12.2012 | |
AT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
MC | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
FR | 31.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
IE | 13.12.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SI | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
LU | 13.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
IT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RO | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
CZ | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
EE | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
SK | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
BE | 23.04.2014 | ||
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
DK | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
PT | 25.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
RS | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 23.04.2014 | |
CY | 23.04.2014 | ||
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
ES | 23.04.2014 | ||
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
HR | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
LV | 23.04.2014 | ||
NL | 23.04.2014 | ||
PL | 23.04.2014 | ||
SE | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
GR | 24.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
FI | 23.04.2014 | ||
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
NO | 23.07.2014 | ||
IS | 23.08.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 23.04.2014 | |
LT | 23.04.2014 | ||
BG | 23.07.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 23.04.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2005142434 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2007314374 (SHINETSU HANDOTAI KK) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2009151077 (SUMCO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004] - [0 26] , [0 48] , [0 62] , [0 86] * * figures 5A, 9 *; | [A]US2011259259 (HARADA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [XP]WO2012089392 (SILTRONIC AG [DE], et al) [XP] 1,3 * claims 3-6 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 3 * * page 7, line 14 - line 15 * | by applicant | JP2003137687 | JP2007191350 |