EP2607628 - Airfoils including compliant tip [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2018 [2018/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shah, Pranav Dhoj General Electric Company, Global Research One Research Circle Bldg. K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Finn, Scott Roger General Electric Company, Global Research One Research Circle Bldg. K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | 03 /
Kray, Nicholas Joseph General Electric Company, Global Research One Research Circle Bldg. K1-3A59 Niskayuna, OH Ohio 12309 / US | 04 /
Prentice, Ian Francis General Electric Company, Global Research One Research Circle Bldg. K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | 05 /
Shim, Dong Jin General Electric Company, Global Research One Research Circle Bldg. K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | 06 /
Wang, Bo General Electric Company, Global Research One Research Circle Bldg. K1-3A59 Niskayuna, NY New York 12309 / US | [2013/26] | Representative(s) | Williams, Andrew Richard GE International Inc. GPO-Europe The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/26] | Williams, Andrew Richard Global Patent Operation - Europe GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 12196990.1 | 13.12.2012 | [2013/26] | Priority number, date | US201113336001 | 23.12.2011 Original published format: US201113336001 | [2013/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2607628 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2607628 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/20, F01D21/04 | [2013/26] | CPC: |
F01D5/20 (EP,US);
F01D21/045 (EP,US);
F01D5/282 (US);
F05D2300/43 (EP,US);
F05D2300/431 (EP,US);
F05D2300/432 (EP,US);
Y02T50/60 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schaufelblätter mit nachgiebiger Spitze | [2013/26] | English: | Airfoils including compliant tip | [2013/26] | French: | Aubes comprenant une extrémité souple | [2013/26] | Examination procedure | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 03.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/49] | 27.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6206642 (MATHENY ALFRED P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * figures 3-5 *; | [XI]EP2273072 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0025] , [0033]; figures 1,2 * [I] 8,10; | [X]US7549841 (MARUSSICH WALTER [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 30; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]US4118147 (ELLIS DELMAR H) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * figure 7 * [I] 8,10; | [X]EP2309098 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,7 * paragraphs [0021] , [0057]; figures 4a-4d *; | [XI]EP2253806 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * paragraph [0032]; figure 1 * [I] 8,10; | [XI]US6431837 (VELICKI ALEXANDER [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * column 7, lines 9-36; figures 4,9 * [I] 8,10 |