Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
14.04.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
16.12.2014 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.11.2014 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
31.10.2014 | First examination report | |
11.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
27.12.2013 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] |
27.12.2013 | Change - designated states | published on 29.01.2014 [2014/05] |
27.09.2013 | Change - inventor | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] |
18.06.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] |