EP2604755 - A precast cementitious paving element and in particular a kerb element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bosun Brick (Proprietary) Limited Cnr Cresset and Musket Road Midrand Industrial Park Midrand / ZA | [2013/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wertheim Aymes, David Carmichael Alexander P.O Box 1231 2161 Sundowner / ZA | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/25] | 01 /
Wertheim Aymes, David Carmichael Alexander Plot 344, Jubilee Road North Riding Estate 2194 Randburg / ZA | Representative(s) | Makovski, Priscilla Mary Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [2013/25] | Application number, filing date | 12197075.0 | 13.12.2012 | [2013/25] | Priority number, date | ZA20110009215 | 14.12.2011 Original published format: ZA 201109215 | ZA20120005695 | 27.07.2012 Original published format: ZA 201205695 | [2013/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2604755 | Date: | 19.06.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E01C5/00, E01C5/06, E01C11/22 | [2013/25] | CPC: |
E01C5/06 (EP);
E01C11/222 (EP);
E01C5/003 (EP);
Y02A30/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorgeformtes Zementpflasterelement und insbesondere ein Bordsteinelement | [2013/25] | English: | A precast cementitious paving element and in particular a kerb element | [2013/25] | French: | Élément de pavage cimentaire préfabriqué et en particulier un élément de bordure | [2013/25] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/05] | 30.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/34] | 13.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/34] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.10.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US3969851 (WHITACRE DANIEL C) [X] 1,11-13 * column 1, lines 10-37 * * column 3, lines 3-36; figures 1,3 * [Y] 11-13; | [XY]DE202011000442U (LITHONPLUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,10 * page 2, paragraphs 1-4 * * page 7, paragraph 49 - page 9, paragraph 60 * * figures 2,3a,4,6,7a,7b * [Y] 11-13; | [X]DE102010000021 (LITHONPLUS GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,10-13 * page 2, paragraphs 7-9 * * page 6, paragraph 58; figures 1-4 *; | [XY]FR1554282 (GEWERKSCHAFT KERAMCHEMIE) [X] 1,11-13 * figure 1; claim 1 * [Y] 9; | [XAY]GB478419 (HUGH GORDON HUGHES, et al) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [A] 10-13 [Y] 9; | [XAY]GB1315772 (STEINER SILIDUR AG) [X] 1-8 * the whole document * [A] 10-13 [Y] 9 |